EP3464733 - A SEABED SUPPORTED UNIT AND METHOD TO PROVIDE A SHALLOW WATER DRILLING TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sembcorp Marine Integrated Yard Pte. Ltd. 29 Tanjong Kling Road Singapore 628054 / SG | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KJERSEM, Geir Lasse Våkleiva 124 5155 Bønes / NO | 02 /
VARTDAL, Harald Bryggeveien 48C 3470 Slemmestad / NO | 03 /
LIM, Kwang Heng c/o Sembcorp Marine Integrated Yard Pte Ltd. 29 Tanjong Kling Road Singapore 628054 / SG | 04 /
ONG, Yee Chin, Mary 13-10 Blk 272C Jurong West Street 24 Singapore 643272 / SG | 05 /
KHOO, Seng Yau 22A, Lorong Hijaun Valdor 36 Hijaun Valdor 14200 Sungai Jawi, S.P.S. Penang / MY | [2019/27] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
KJERSEM, Geir Lasse Våkleiva 124 5155 Bønes / NO | ||
02 /
VARTDAL, Harald Bryggeveien 48C 3470 Slemmestad / NO | |||
03 /
LIM, Kwang Heng c/o Sembcorp Marine Integrated Yard Pte Ltd. 29 Tanjong Kling Road Singapore 628054 / SG | |||
04 /
ONG, Yee Chin, Mary 13-10 Blk 272C Jurong West Street 24 Singapore 643272 / SG | |||
05 /
KHOO, Seng Yau c/o Sembcorp Marine Integrated Yard Pte Ltd. 29 Tanjong Kling Road Singapore 628054 / SG | Representative(s) | Acapo AS Edvard Griegs vei 1 5059 Bergen / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | Application number, filing date | 17803178.7 | 25.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017SG50270 | Priority number, date | NO20160000906 | 26.05.2016 Original published format: NO 20160906 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017204749 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464733 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02B17/00, B63B35/44 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
E02B17/027 (EP,US);
E21B43/01 (NO);
E02B17/021 (KR);
B63B35/4413 (KR);
E02B17/02 (EP,RU,US);
E02B17/025 (US);
E02B3/06 (NO);
E02D27/52 (NO);
E02D29/02 (NO);
E21B15/003 (US);
E21B15/02 (US);
E21B7/12 (EP,US);
E21B7/124 (NO);
E21B7/136 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0039 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | MEERESBODENGESTÜTZTE EINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES FLACHWASSERBOHRANSCHLUSSES | [2019/15] | English: | A SEABED SUPPORTED UNIT AND METHOD TO PROVIDE A SHALLOW WATER DRILLING TERMINAL | [2019/15] | French: | UNITÉ SUPPORTÉE SUR LE FOND MARIN ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR UN TERMINAL DE FORAGE D'EAU PEU PROFONDE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014147214 (FOO KOK SENG [SG], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2017168381 (SEMBCORP MARINE INTEGRATED YARD PTE LTD [SG]) [E] 1-13* the whole document *; | [E]EP3250758 (GRAVI FLOAT AS [NO]) [E] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6340272 (RUNGE KARL H [US], et al) [A] 0 * Whole document *; | [A]US2004151549 (ROODENBURG JOOP [NL], et al) [A] 0 * Paragraphs [0052]-[0054], [0067]; figures 1-2, 10 *; | [XA]US2005217554 (STEEN GERRY [SE]) [X] 10-13 * Paragraphs [0001 ]-[0003], [0042]-[0056]; figures 1, 5 * [A] 1-9; | [A]US2013098627 (JORDAN TRAVIS RANDALL [US], et al) [A] 0 * Paragraphs [0027]-[0028]; figure 3A *; | [PA]WO2016085347 (GRAVI FLOAT AS [NO]) [PA] 1-9* Page 14, lines 6-27; figure 1 *; | [A] - GRAVIFLOAT Near Shore Terminal Solution s, (20150424), URL: http://www.mpa.gov.sg/web/wcm/connect/www/bd26907c-7f5f-48b8-b7c2-054861f13b70/kjersem_gravifloat.pdf?MOD=AJPERES, (20170714), XP055525185 [A] 1-9 * Whole document * | by applicant | GB1369915 | US3958426 | WO2006041312 | WO2013002648 | US2014147214 | WO2015050156 | WO2016085347 | NO20160518 | WO2017168381 | WO2015CN50156 |