EP3464922 - ONE-WAY CLUTCH ASSEMBLY AND COUPLING MEMBER FOR THEREIN WHEREIN LOCKING MEMBER DYNAMICS WITH RESPECT TO STRUT LAYDOWN SPEED ARE ENHANCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Means Industries, Inc. 3715 East Washington Road Saginaw, MI 48601-2893 / US | [2024/38] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Means Industries, Inc. 3715 East Washington Road Saginaw, MI 48601-2893 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOELKER, Brandon 4726 Wintergreen Dr. N. Saginaw, Michigan 48603 / US | 02 /
ANDRZEJEWSKI, Todd 12028 Rachael Montrose, Michigan 48457 / US | 03 /
COPPENS, George 3350 Grande Court Bay City, Michigan 48706 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
VOELKER, Brandon 1 Alton Ct. Saginaw, Michigan 48603 / US | ||
02 /
ANDRZEJEWSKI, Todd 12028 Rachael Montrose, Michigan 48457 / US | |||
03 /
COPPENS, George 3350 Grande Court Bay City, Michigan 48706 / US | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/38] |
Former [2019/15] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17803310.6 | 18.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US33216 | Priority number, date | US201662340723P | 24.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662340723 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017205165 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464922 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464922 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/12, F16D11/06, F16D41/00, F16D41/16, F16D41/24, F16H41/24 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
F16D41/125 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2011/006 (KR);
F16D2011/008 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEGKUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG UND KOPPLUNGSELEMENT DAFÜR MIT VERBESSERTER VERRIEGELUNGSELEMENTDYNAMIK IN BEZUG AUF DIE FEDERBEINEINBAULEISTUNG | [2019/15] | English: | ONE-WAY CLUTCH ASSEMBLY AND COUPLING MEMBER FOR THEREIN WHEREIN LOCKING MEMBER DYNAMICS WITH RESPECT TO STRUT LAYDOWN SPEED ARE ENHANCED | [2019/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE EMBRAYAGE UNIDIRECTIONNEL ET ÉLÉMENT D'ACCOUPLEMENT ASSOCIÉ DONT LES DYNAMIQUES D'ÉLÉMENT DE VERROUILLAGE PAR RAPPORT À LA VITESSE DE DESCENTE DE JAMBE DE FORCE SONT AMÉLIORÉES | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 05.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 20.12.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6116394 (RUTH STEPHEN M [US]); | [X]US6577033 (SEKINE KATSUMI [JP]) | International search | [Y]US6116394 (RUTH STEPHEN M [US]) [Y] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]US6186299 (RUTH STEPHEN M [US]) [Y] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2006278486 (PAWLEY BRICE A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2011214962 (SHAW DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-19* entire document * |