EP3534943 - REPLICATION-DEFICIENT ARENAVIRUS PARTICLES AND TRI-SEGMENTED ARENAVIRUS PARTICLES AS CANCER VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hookipa Biotech GmbH Helmut-Qualtinger-Gasse 2 1030 Wien / AT | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Sarah Eroicagasse 7/5/2 1190 Vienna / AT | 02 /
ORLINGER, Klaus Schätzgasse 4/1 1190 Vienna / AT | 03 /
RING, Sandra Stephanie Münchner Str. 101 85774 Unterföhring / DE | 04 /
FLATZ, Lukas Roland Falkenstrasse 6 8400 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Sarah Seuttergasse 44/24 1130 Vienna / AT | ||
02 /
ORLINGER, Klaus Schätzgasse 4/1 1190 Vienna / AT | |||
03 /
RING, Sandra Stephanie Münchner Str. 101 85774 Unterföhring / DE | |||
04 /
FLATZ, Lukas Roland Falkenstrasse 6 8400 Winterthur / CH | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17804079.6 | 03.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017EP78149 | Priority number, date | US201662417865P | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662417865 P | US201662417891P | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662417891 P | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018083220 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3534943 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/001156 (EP,US);
A61K39/001192 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/572 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | REPLIKATIONSDEFIZIENTE ARENAVIRUSPARTIKEL UND TRI-SEGMENTIERTE ARENAVIRUSPARTIKEL ALS KREBSIMPFSTOFFE | [2019/37] | English: | REPLICATION-DEFICIENT ARENAVIRUS PARTICLES AND TRI-SEGMENTED ARENAVIRUS PARTICLES AS CANCER VACCINES | [2019/37] | French: | PARTICULES D'ARÉNAVIRUS À DÉFICIENCE DE RÉPLICATION ET PARTICULES D'ARÉNAVIRUS TRI-SEGMENTÉES UTILISÉES COMME DE VACCINS CONTRE LE CANCER | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 24.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | GB2220211 | US5057540 | WO2007109812 | WO2007109813 | WO2009083210 | WO2014140301 | WO2015082570 | WO2016075250 | WO2017EP61865 |