EP3563207 - CONTROL VALVE FOR REGULATION OF DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE AND/OR FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/45] | CONTROL FITTING FOR CONTROLLING THE DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE AND/OR THE VOLUMETRIC FLOW | ||
[2020/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oventrop GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Oventrop-Strasse 1 59939 Olsberg / DE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMBRING, Stefan Fingerhutweg 14 59939 Olsberg / DE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17804801.3 | 15.11.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017DE100967 | Priority number, date | DE201610125734 | 27.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016125734 | [2019/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018121811 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3563207 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3563207 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/22, F16K31/365, F16K37/00, G05D7/00, F24D19/10 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
F16K11/22 (EP,KR);
G05D7/005 (EP,KR);
F24D19/1066 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/365 (EP,KR);
F16K37/005 (EP,KR);
F24D19/1015 (EP,KR,US);
F24D19/1024 (EP,US);
F24D19/1033 (EP,KR,US);
F24D19/1036 (EP,KR,US);
G05D7/0113 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/45] | G05D7/01, F24D19/10, F16K1/52, G05D16/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELARMATUR ZUR REGELUNG DES DIFFERENZDRUCKES UND/ODER DES VOLUMENSTROMES | [2019/45] | English: | CONTROL VALVE FOR REGULATION OF DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE AND/OR FLOW | [2020/21] | French: | VANNE DE RÉGULATION DE LA PRESSION DIFFÉRENTIELLE ET/OU DU DÉBIT | [2020/21] |
Former [2019/45] | CONTROL FITTING FOR CONTROLLING THE DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE AND/OR THE VOLUMETRIC FLOW | ||
Former [2019/45] | VANNE DE RÉGULATION POUR RÉGLER LA PRESSION DIFFÉRENTIELLE ET/OU LE DÉBIT VOLUMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 21.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2017 | AL | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | IT | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | MT | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | TR | 07.10.2020 | IE | 15.11.2020 | LU | 15.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.11.2017 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MT | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
TR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.11.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 |