EP3717674 - DEPOSITION APPARATUS, METHOD OF COATING A FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE AND FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE HAVING A COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABERKORN, Edgar Lettgenbrunner Str. 14 63637 Jossgrund / DE | 02 /
LORENZ, Stefan Auwanne 8 63791 Karlstein / DE | 03 /
HEIN, Stefan Amselweg 9 63825 Blankenbach / DE | 04 /
MORRISON, Neil Rosenhöhweg 25 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
KUKLA, Reiner Bühlweg 7 63457 Hanau / DE | 06 /
KURTHEN, Christof Pfarrer-Grimm-Str. 20 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | 07 /
DEPPISCH, Thomas An den Bornwiesen 11 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 17804899.7 | 28.11.2017 | [2020/41] | WO2017EP80694 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105534 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717674 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/06, C23C14/34, C23C14/56, C23C14/58 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
C23C14/0605 (EP,KR);
C23C14/562 (EP,KR);
C23C14/5833 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/0611 (US);
C23C14/3414 (KR);
C23C14/3435 (EP);
C23C14/3442 (KR);
C23C14/3485 (US);
C23C14/505 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN SUBSTRATS UND FLEXIBLES SUBSTRAT MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | DEPOSITION APPARATUS, METHOD OF COATING A FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE AND FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE HAVING A COATING | [2020/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉPÔT, PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT SOUPLE ET SUBSTRAT SOUPLE MUNI D'UN REVÊTEMENT | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63307268 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [A] 6,12 * paragraph [0001]; figures 6,7 *; | [A]DE102004004177 (AXYNTEC DUENNSCHICHTTECHNIK GM [DE]) [A] 6,12 * paragraph [0027]; claim 1 *; | [X]US2012021201 (JUN YOUNGHA [KR], et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0049] *; | [XI]WO2016182171 (GENECOAT LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0038] , [0039] , [0044]; figure 1 * [I] 4-7,10,12; | [A]US2017067155 (LI JAIME ANTONIO [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11* claim 20 *; | [A]CN206204411U (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [A] 9 * abstract *; | WO2018001523 [ ] (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al); | [XA] - KONOSUKE INAGAWA ET AL, "Characteristics of Diamondlike Carbon Film Deposited by Magnetron Plasma Enhanced Chemical Vapor Deposition Using a Roll Coater.", SHINKU / VACUUM SOCIETY OF JAPAN. JOURNAL., JP, (20000101), vol. 43, no. 5, doi:10.3131/jvsj.43.599, ISSN 0559-8516, pages 599 - 602, XP055495236 [X] 15 * abstract * [A] 6,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3131/jvsj.43.599 | [A] - NEIL A. MORRISON ET AL, "Roll-to-Roll processing of flexible devices and components : Utilization in wearable and mobile electronics and the coming IOT era", VAKUUM IN FORSCHUNG UND PRAXIS, DE, (20160901), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1002/vipr.201600612, ISSN 0947-076X, pages 30 - 35, XP055495446 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/vipr.201600612 |