EP3463038 - ENDOSCOPY SYSTEM COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endomaster Pte Ltd 2 Boon Leat Terrace 04-01 Harbourside Building 2 Singapore 119844 / SG | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNY, Isaac David c/o EndoMaster Pte. Ltd. 2 Boon Leat Terrace 04-01 Harbourside Building 2 Singapore 119844 / SG | 02 /
LWIN, Tae Zar c/o EndoMaster Pte. Ltd. 2 Boon Leat Terrace 04-01 Harbourside Building 2 Singapore 119844 / SG | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Tomonori c/o EndoMaster Pte. Ltd. 2 Boon Leat Terrace 04-01 Harbourside Building 2 Singapore 119844 / SG | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17807124.7 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017SG50280 | Priority number, date | US201662344393P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344393 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017209695 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3463038 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3463038 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/005, A61B1/018, A61B34/00, // A61B18/00, A61B18/14, A61B90/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
A61B1/018 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0051 (EP,CN);
A61B1/00006 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0002 (CN,US);
A61B1/00039 (CN);
A61B1/00042 (EP,US);
A61B1/0008 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/00128 (CN,US);
A61B1/00133 (CN,US);
A61B1/00147 (CN);
A61B1/00148 (US);
A61B1/0016 (EP,CN);
A61B1/0057 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/2909 (CN,US);
A61B18/1482 (CN,US);
A61B34/37 (CN,US);
A61B34/71 (EP,CN,US);
A61B34/76 (US);
A61B34/77 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/00212 (CN,US);
A61B2017/00398 (CN,US);
A61B2018/00595 (CN,US);
A61B2018/00982 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/301 (US);
A61B2034/715 (EP,CN);
A61B2090/062 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | A61B1/00, A61B1/005, A61B1/018 | ||
Former IPC [2019/15] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPIESYSTEMKOMPONENTEN | [2019/15] | English: | ENDOSCOPY SYSTEM COMPONENTS | [2019/15] | French: | COMPOSANTS D'UN SYSTÈME D'ENDOSCOPIE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23150127.1 / EP4183315 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | GB | 01.06.2023 | IE | 01.06.2023 | LU | 01.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
GB | 01.06.2023 | ||
IE | 01.06.2023 | ||
LU | 01.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
IE | 01.06.2023 | ||
LU | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
LU | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005222554 (WALLACE DANIEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14 * paragraphs [0212] , [0214] - [0220] - [0238] , [0239] * * figures 104, 110A-110E, 111 * [Y] 7 [I] 8,15; | [A]US2013085336 (KASAI YOICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]WO2015142290 (ENDOMASTER PTE LTD [SG]) [Y] 7 * figure 14B * | International search | [X]WO2004030528 (SPINEMED AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 7-8; page 20, line 6 - page 21, line 28; claim 4 *; | [X]JP2009201682 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-12 * figure 1, 6-21; abstract; para.[0026]-[0090] of the machine translation *; | [X]US2011166420 (MIESNER HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-12* figures 1-3; para.[0016]-[0018], [0027]-[0031] *; | [X]US2011245661 (YOSHIE MICHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 2-9, 12; para.[0035]-[0043], [0065]-[0066] *; | [X]EP2377457 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figure 2; para.[0010], [0014]-[0022] *; | [X]US2011288371 (TAKAHASHI KAZUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figure 3; para.[0025]-[0028] * |