EP3465355 - METHOD OF MUSIC INSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Downey, Patrick M. 412 French Street Bangor, Maine 04401 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17807253.4 | 24.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US34148 | Priority number, date | US201615169803 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US201615169803 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017210049 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465355 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G04F5/02, G09B15/00, G09B5/04 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
G04F5/025 (EP,US);
G09B15/00 (EP,US);
G09B5/04 (EP);
G10H1/06 (EP,US);
G10H1/42 (EP,US);
G10H2210/301 (EP,US);
G10H2210/571 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G04F5/02, G09B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR MUSIKUNTERRICHT | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD OF MUSIC INSTRUCTION | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSTRUCTION MUSICALE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004234076 (AGOSTINI LUIGI [IT]) [I] 1-16* paragraph [0024] *; | [I]WO2015032009 (RECABAL GUIRALDES PABLO [CL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * | International search | [A]US9116509 (TAKAHASHI SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2011083544 (ROGITZ LEO C [US]) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2006070511 (PARSONS CHRISTOPHER V [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2004234076 (AGOSTINI LUIGI [IT]) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *; | [A]WO03015471 (A & G SOLUZIONI DIGITALI S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. * |