EP3541836 - AGENTS, USES AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SYNUCLEINOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALLUNKI, Pekka c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | 02 /
KRISTJANSEN, Paul, E, G c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | 03 /
STAVENHAGEN, Jeffrey B. 55 West 5th Ave. Apt 3B San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2019/39] | 01 /
KALLUNKI, Pekka c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | ||
02 /
KRISTJANSEN, Paul, E, G c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | Representative(s) | H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17807745.9 | 14.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017EP79153 | Priority number, date | DK2016PA00710 | 15.11.2016 Original published format: DK PA201600710 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018091444 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541836 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, A61P25/28, A61K39/395 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/197 (US);
A61K39/395 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P25/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (US);
A61K2039/545 (KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | 17.06.2019 | ME | 17.06.2019 | Validation states | MA | 17.06.2019 | Title | German: | MITTEL, VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SYNUKLEINOPATHIEN | [2019/39] | English: | AGENTS, USES AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SYNUCLEINOPATHY | [2019/39] | French: | AGENTS, UTILISATIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SYNUCLÉINOPATHIE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 17.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2008103472 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2011104696 (BIOARCTIC NEUROSCIENCE AB [SE], et al); | [XI]WO2012177972 (BIOGEN IDEC INTERNAT NEUROSCIENCE GMBH [CH], et al); | [I]WO2014132210 (UNIV UNITED ARAB EMIRATES [AE]); | [XI]WO2015001504 (NEOTOPE BIOSCIENCES LTD [IE]); | [I]EP3067066 (PROTHENA BIOSCIENCES LTD [IE], et al); | [XP]WO2017009312 (H LUNDBECK AS [DK]); | [E]WO2017207739 (MEDIMMUNE LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US4179337 | US4495285 | US4609546 | US4766106 | US4946778 | WO9203918 | WO9222645 | WO9301227 | US5225539 | WO9425585 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5569825 | US5585089 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US5741957 | US5750172 | US5756687 | WO9824884 | US5770429 | US5789650 | US5814318 | US5827690 | US5859205 | US5874299 | US5877397 | WO0109187 | WO0114424 | WO0243478 | US6407213 | US6881557 | WO2007059782 | US2008175838 | WO2009097006 | US2012308572 | US8632776 | US2014127131 |