EP3548595 - ELECTROLYTIC SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-BAYATI, Alias Younis c/o Reckitt Benckiser Global R&D GmbH Robert Kochstrasse 1 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
PFLUG, Joerg Peter c/o Reckitt Benckiser Global GmbH Robert Kochstrasse 1 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
KÄMMERER, Gerhard . Deceased / DE | 04 /
COUSER, Callum c/o Reckitt Benckiser Global GmbH Robert Kochstrasse 1 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | Leslie, Edward, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17808409.1 | 28.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP80635 | Priority number, date | GB20160020479 | 02.12.2016 Original published format: GB 201620479 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099903 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548595 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D3/386, C11D3/04, A47L15/42, D06F35/00, A47L15/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A47L15/4238 (EP,US);
A47L15/00 (RU);
A47L15/0002 (GB);
C25B9/17 (US);
A47L15/0005 (GB);
A47L15/0007 (GB,US);
A47L15/0015 (US);
A47L15/0055 (US);
A47L15/42 (RU);
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D3/386 (EP,RU,US);
C11D3/395 (RU);
C11D3/3953 (US);
C25B1/34 (US);
A47L2601/03 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTISCHES SYSTEM FÜR DIE AUTOMATISCHE GESCHIRRSPÜLUNG | [2019/41] | English: | ELECTROLYTIC SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING | [2019/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉLECTROLYTIQUE POUR LE LAVAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA VAISSELLE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 24.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]CH634217 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]); | [IY]US2003216271 (SCHEPER WILLIAM MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2003213503 (PRICE KENNETH NATHAN [US], et al) | by applicant | EP2380481 | WO2016020680 |