EP3562559 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PLANT EXTRACT OF THE SPECIE HEDYCHIUM CORONARIUM, FOR USE IN A METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF THE HUMAN BODY BY THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société d'Exploitation de Produits pour les Industries Chimiques SEPPIC 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANCHARTECHAHAR, Virginie 7 Allée Paul Gaugin 64140 Lons / FR | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Laigneau, Amandine L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17808525.4 | 08.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017EP81977 | Priority number, date | EP20160207612 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16207612 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018121973 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562559 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q17/00, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/08, A61K8/9794, A61P17/16, A61P17/18 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61Q17/00 (EP);
A61K36/906 (KR,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,KR);
A61P17/00 (KR);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
A61Q19/02 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP);
A61K2236/333 (US);
A61K2236/53 (US);
A61K2800/522 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM PFLANZENEXTRAKT DER SPEZIES HEDYCHIUM CORONARIUM ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERS DURCH THERAPIE | [2019/45] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PLANT EXTRACT OF THE SPECIE HEDYCHIUM CORONARIUM, FOR USE IN A METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF THE HUMAN BODY BY THERAPY | [2019/45] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE PLANTE DE L'ESPÈCE HEDYCHIUM CORONARIUM, DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UNE MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU CORPS HUMAIN PAR THÉRAPIE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 30.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]KR20130106599 ; | [XI]WO9209295 (MRAK MAGDALENA [CH]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 10 - page 3, line 15 * * page 9, line 3 - page 9, line 8 * * claim 1 * * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 7 * [I] 6-8; | [XI]CN105169172 ; | [XI]CN104547591 ; | [XI]CN103768531 ; | [XDI]WO02056859 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [XD] 1-4 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 4 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 13 * * examples 1-3 * [I] 5-8; | [A]US2004086526 (DANOUX LOUIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XD]BRPI0905586 | [XI] - Anonymous, "Take Refuge from Irritated Skin", (20140708), CoValence LABORATORIES, URL: http://covalence.com/blog/take-refuge-irritated-skin, (20170411), XP002769425 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - anonymous, "Sugar Scrub", GNPD, MINTEL, (201202), Database accession no. 1726346, XP002769426 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - anonymous, "Aliali Brightening Serum", GNPD, MINTEL, (200908), Database accession no. 1157261, XP002769427 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - anonymous, "Daily Protecting Moisturizer SPF 15", GNPD, MINTEL, (201006), Database accession no. 1388777, XP002769428 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - anonymous, "Pores Refreshing Face Cleanser", GNPD, MINTEL, (201207), Database accession no. 1826677, XP002769429 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-8 | [A] - anonymous, "Ultralight Grooming Spray", GNPD, MINTEL, (201402), Database accession no. 2309026, XP002769430 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - anonymous, "Conditioner", GNPD, MINTEL, (201004), Database accession no. 1312549, XP002769431 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - "Hedychium Coronarium Root Extract", Joanne Nikitakis, Halyna P. Breslawec, International Cosmetic Ingredient Dioctionary and Handbook, Washington, D.C., Personal Care Products Council, (2014), vol. 1, page 1461, XP002769432 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 06, Database accession no. 2013-Q85083, XP002769433 & KR20130106599 A 20130930 (UNIV IND & ACADEMIC COOP IN CHUNGNAM NAT) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 33, Database accession no. 2016-030677, XP002769434 & CN105169172 A 20151223 (NANJING JINGYUN CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * embodiment 1 * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 50, Database accession no. 2015-391311, XP002769435 & CN104547591 A 20150429 (MENG X) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * ointment embodiment * [I] 6-8 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 62, Database accession no. 2014-M48930, XP002769436 & CN103768531 A 20140507 (LIU Y) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [I] 6-8 | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 14, Database accession no. 2012-B17093, XP002777696 & BRPI0905586 A2 20110823 (MENEGHETTI IND E COM ARTIGOS VESTUARIO) [XD] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | WO02056859 | BRPI0905586 | WO2006053415 | FR2668080 | FR2734496 | FR2756195 | FR2762317 | FR2784680 | FR2784904 | FR2791565 | FR2790977 | FR2807435 | FR2804432 | - ANDREA JOHAN RETZIUS, Observationes Botanicae, pages 73 - 74 | - FRANCIS BUCHANAN-HAMILTON, "the Cyclopaedia; universal dictionary Arts, Sciences and Literature", Abraham REES, pages 521 - 522 | - "Edible Medicinal and non medicinal Plants", Flowers, vol. 8, pages 853 - 860 | - SHARMA et al., Phytochemistry, (19750000), vol. 14, page 578 | - BECKER A; KLAPCZYNSKI A; KUCH N; ARPINO F; SIMON-KELLER K; DE LA TORRE C; STICHT C; VAN ABEELEN FA; OVERSLUIZEN G; GRETZ N., "Gene expression profiling reveals aryl hydrocarbon receptor as a possible target for photobiomodulation when using blue light", Sci Rep., (20160000), vol. 6, page 33847 | - DAVIDSON MW., "Animal cell structure. Lysosomes", Molecular expressions, (20150000), URL: http://micro.magnet.fsu.edu/cells/lvsosomes/lvsosomes.html | - KOKER EB; BILSKI PJ; MOTTEN AG; ZHAO B; CHIGNELL CF; HE YY, "Real-time visualization of photochemically induced fluorescence of 8-halogenated quinolones: lomefloxacin, clinafloxacin and Bay3118 in live human HaCaT keratinocytes", Photochem Photobiol, (20100000), vol. 86, no. 4, pages 792 - 797 | - MORLIERE P; HAIGLE J; AISSANI K; FILIPE P; SILVA JN; SANTUS R., "An insight into the mechanisms of the phototoxic response induced by cyamemazine in cultured fibroblasts and keratinocytes", Photochem Photobiol, (20040000), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 163 - 71 | - GARRIDO-MARAVER J; CORDERO MD; MONINO ID et al., "Screening of effective pharmacological treatments for MELAS syndrome using yeasts, fibroblasts and cybrid models of the disease", Br J Pharmacol., (20120000), vol. 167, no. 6, pages 1311 - 1328 | - MIZUSHIMA N; LEVINE B; CUERVO AM; KLIONSKY DJ., "Autophagy fights disease through cellular self-digestion", Nature, (20080000), vol. 451, no. 7182, pages 1069 - 75 | - JIANG P; MIZUSHIMA N., "Autophagy and human diseases", Cell Res., (20140000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 69 - 79 | - BIEDERBICK A; KERN HF; ELSASSER HP, "Monodansylcadaverine (MDC) is a specific in vivo marker for autophagic vacuoles", Eur J Cell Biol., (19950000), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 3 - 14 |