EP3552160 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COORDINATION AMONG A PLURALITY OF VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHANAN, Roderick BAE Systems Warton Aerodrome Warton Preston Lancashire PR4 1AX / GB | 02 /
FREEMAN, Richard, Charles BAE Systems Warton Aerodrome Warton Preston Leicestershire PR4 1AX / GB | 03 /
CLARK, David, William, Thomas BAE Systems Warton Aerodrome Warton Preston Leicestershire PR4 1AX / GB | 04 /
THOMAS, Andrew, James BAE Systems Warton Aerodrome Warton Preston Leicestershire PR4 1AX / GB | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2023/21] |
Former [2019/42] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17808564.3 | 04.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017GB53650 | Priority number, date | GB20160021113 | 12.12.2016 Original published format: GB 201621113 | EP20170275023 | 22.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17275023 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018109438 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552160 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3552160 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G06Q10/06, G06Q30/08, G08G5/00 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G05D1/0088 (EP,US);
G08G5/0008 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP);
G06Q30/08 (EP);
G07C5/008 (US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
G08G5/0052 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | G06Q10/06, G05D1/00, G08G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOORDINATION ZWISCHEN MEHREREN FAHRZEUGEN | [2022/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COORDINATION AMONG A PLURALITY OF VEHICLES | [2019/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COORDINATION ENTRE PLUSIEURS VÉHICULES | [2022/50] |
Former [2019/42] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOORDINATION ZWISCHEN EINER VIELZAHL VON FAHRZEUGEN | ||
Former [2019/42] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COORDINATION ENTRE UNE PLURALITÉ DE VÉHICULES | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 11.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007112700 (DEN HAAN ALBERT [CA], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0062] - [0076] - [0107] - [0113] - [0136] - [0143]; figures 1,3 *; | [XI]US2014074339 (CASADO ENRIQUE JUAN MAGANA [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,10-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,7,9,13; | [I] - DIAS M B ET AL, "Market-Based Multirobot Coordination: A Survey and Analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20060701), vol. 94, no. 7, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2006.876939, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1257 - 1270, XP011442759 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2006.876939 |