EP3509641 - FORMULATIONS OF 4-METHYL-5-(PYRAZIN-2-YL)-3H-1.2-DITHIOLE-3-THIONE, TASTE-MODIFIED FORMULATIONS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST IP Holding AG Baarerstrasse 2 Postfach 330 6301 Zug / CH | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARLAND, Anthony, Chris 5670 Wilshire Blvd. Ste. 1740 Los Angeles CA 90036 / US | 02 /
BORMANN-KENNEDY, Barbara-Jean, Anne 1188 Broadway, Apt.306 Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 03 /
FRAMROZE, Bomi 3 Shree Sadan 4A Carmichael Rd. Mumbai 400026 / IN | 04 /
BERNER, Bret 424 Lee Avenue Half Moon Bay CA 94019 / US | 05 /
GRASS, Michael, Edward 64550 NW Torsway St. Bend, OR 97703 / US | 06 /
JAGER, Casey, Keith 1830 NW Glassow Dr. Bend OR 97703 / US | 07 /
BLOOM, Corey, Jay 19379 Blue Lake Loop Bend OR 97702 / US | 08 /
KASTANTIN, Mark, Joseph 2485 NW Brickyard St. Bend OR 97703 / US | 09 /
BACHELARD, Romain V. Mane Fils 620 Route De Grasse 06620 Le Bar-sur-loup / FR | [2019/32] |
Former [2019/29] | 01 /
GARLAND, Anthony, Chris 5670 Wilshire Blvd. Ste. 1740 Los Angeles CA 90036 / US | ||
02 /
BORMANN-KENNEDY, Barbara-Jean, Anne 35 Leila Rich Drive Wellfleet MA 02667 / US | |||
03 /
FRAMROZE, Bomi 3 Shree Sadan 4A Carmichael Rd. Mumbai 400026 / IN | |||
04 /
BERNER, Bret 424 Lee Avenue Half Moon Bay CA 94019 / US | |||
05 /
GRASS, Michael, Edward 64550 NW Torsway St. Bend, OR 97703 / US | |||
06 /
JAGER, Casey, Keith 1830 NW Glassow Dr. Bend OR 97703 / US | |||
07 /
BLOOM, Corey, Jay 19379 Blue Lake Loop Bend OR 97702 / US | |||
08 /
KASTANTIN, Mark, Joseph 2485 NW Brickyard St. Bend OR 97703 / US | |||
09 /
BACHELARD, Romain V. Mane Fils 620 Route De Grasse 06620 Le Bar-sur-loup / FR | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17808566.8 | 12.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017IB01231 | Priority number, date | IN201611031046 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: IN201611031046 | IN201611031045 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: IN201611031045 | US201662412701P | 25.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662412701 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018047002 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509641 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/32, A61K31/385, C07D409/04 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/497 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (KR);
A61K47/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/38 (KR);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K9/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/145 (US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN VON 4-METHYL-5-(PYRAZIN-2-YL)-3H-1.2-DITHIOL-3-THION, GESCHMACKSMODIFIZIERTE FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/29] | English: | FORMULATIONS OF 4-METHYL-5-(PYRAZIN-2-YL)-3H-1.2-DITHIOLE-3-THIONE, TASTE-MODIFIED FORMULATIONS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2019/29] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE 4-MÉTHYL-5-(PYRAZIN-2-YL)-3H-1,2-DITHIOLE-3-THIONE, FORMULATIONS À GOÛT MODIFIÉ, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 11.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 19.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2023 | 30.09.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0185142 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al); | [A]WO2004048369 (CJ CORP [KR], et al); | [XY]WO2005070397 (CJ CORP); | [AD]WO2008110585 (PRENDERGAST PATRICK T [AU]); | [X]WO2012170676 (STI PHARMA LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2013043553 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al); | by applicant | US3156369 | US4110450 | US6148996 | WO0185142 | US2008202949 | WO2008110585 | EP2536412 | US2014065219 | WO2014177519 | WO2016207914 |