EP3541509 - CRUSH STRENGTH AND POROSITY OF AN ALUMINA CARRIER FOR ENHANCED CATALYSTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VINYL ACETATE MONOMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LyondellBasell Acetyls, LLC 1221 McKinney, Suite 700 Lyondellbasell Tower Houston, TX 77010 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Daniel, F. c/ o Lyondellbasell Legal IP Dept 1221 McKinney Street Suite 700 Houston, TX 77010 / US | 02 /
TE, Mure c/ o Lyondellbasell Legal IP Dept 1221 McKinney Street Suite 700 Houston, TX 77010 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | LyondellBasell c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia Intellectual Property P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Sacco, Marco Equistar Chemicals, LP IP Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12, Casella Postale 19 44122 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 17809122.9 | 15.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US61812 | Priority number, date | US201662423642P | 17.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662423642 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093909 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541509 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/58, B01J37/18, B01J37/02, B01J37/08, C07C67/055, B01J21/04, B01J35/10, B01J23/52, B01J37/03, C07C69/15, B01J31/04 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B01J23/66 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
B01J31/04 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J35/30 (US);
B01J35/31 (EP,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,US);
B01J35/612 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/651 (EP,US);
B01J35/653 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,US);
B01J37/031 (EP,US);
B01J37/033 (EP,US);
B01J37/035 (EP,US);
B01J37/06 (EP,US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
B01J37/18 (EP,US);
C07C67/055 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/055, C07C69/15 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/19, B01J2523/824 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | DRUCKFESTIGKEIT UND POROSITÄT EINES ALUMINIUMOXIDTRÄGERS FÜR VERBESSERTE KATALYSATOREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VINYLACETATMONOMER | [2019/39] | English: | CRUSH STRENGTH AND POROSITY OF AN ALUMINA CARRIER FOR ENHANCED CATALYSTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VINYL ACETATE MONOMER | [2019/39] | French: | RÉSISTANCE À L'ÉCRASEMENT ET POROSITÉ D'UN SUPPORT D'ALUMINE POUR CATALYSEURS AMÉLIORÉS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MONOMÈRE D'ACÉTATE DE VINYLE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 29.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5808136 (TACKE THOMAS [DE], et al) [I] 1-20 * examples 17,13, comp. examples 2, 1 *; | [I]CA2205416 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [I] 1-20 * page 21; example 3 * * page 25, line 7 - page 26, line 32; example 10 * * page 27, line 4 - page 28, line 21 *; | [A]WO03061829 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-20* page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 5 *; | [I]US2011306748 (SHAY DANIEL TRAVIS [US]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032] - [0035]; example C.4; table 1 * | by applicant | US3743607 | US4119567 | US6022823 | US2011087047 | US2011137075 | US8399700 | US8501984 |