EP3548689 - METHOD FOR INSTALLING A FRAMEWORK STRUCTURE OF A PIECE OF HOME AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/41] | FRAMEWORK STRUCTURE OF A PIECE OF HOME AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A FRAMEWORK STRUCTURE OF A PIECE OF HOME AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT | ||
[2023/48] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOMFY ACTIVITES SA 50 Avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCRETET-PAJOT, Guillaume 4 rue Racine 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
CACHAUD, Bruno 2 Rue Froide 16350 Champagne Mouton / FR | 03 /
DUPIELET, Norbert 351 Quai de Warens 74700 Sallanches / FR | 04 /
NEGRELLO, Frédéric 24 rue Georges Guynemer 74300 Cluses / FR | 05 /
PERACHE, Jean-Michel 620 chemin de Maneguet 74440 Taninges / FR | 06 /
GUEDON, Pierre 5G chemin de Parsonge 69570 Dardilly / FR | [2019/42] |
Former [2019/41] | 01 /
DUCRETET-PAJOT, Guillaume 4 rue Racine 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | ||
02 /
CACHAUD, Bruno 2 Rue Froide 16350 Champagne Mouton / FR | |||
03 /
DUPIELET, Norbert 351 Quai de Warens 74700 Sallanches / FR | |||
04 /
NEGRELLO, Frédéric 2 avenue des Lacs 74300 Cluses / FR | |||
05 /
PERACHE, Jean-Michel 620 chemin de Maneguet 74440 Taninges / FR | |||
06 /
GUEDON, Pierre 5G chemin de Parsonge 69570 Dardilly / FR | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion SA 10, route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17809290.4 | 05.12.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP81574 | Priority number, date | FR20160061905 | 05.12.2016 Original published format: FR 1661905 | [2019/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018104335 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548689 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3548689 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/30, F16B5/02, F16B5/06 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H01H9/02 (EP);
F16B5/0225 (EP,US);
B60Q1/045 (US);
F16B5/0233 (US);
F16B5/0283 (US);
F16B5/0628 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION EINER RAHMENSTRUKTUR EINES TEILS EINER HEIMAUTOMATISIERUNGSAUSRÜSTUNG | [2023/48] | English: | METHOD FOR INSTALLING A FRAMEWORK STRUCTURE OF A PIECE OF HOME AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'UNE ARMATURE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DOMOTIQUE | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/41] | RAHMENSTRUKTUR EINES TEILS EINER HEIMAUTOMATISIERUNGSAUSRÜSTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION EINER RAHMENSTRUKTUR EINES TEILS EINER HEIMAUTOMATISIERUNGSAUSRÜSTUNG | ||
Former [2019/41] | FRAMEWORK STRUCTURE OF A PIECE OF HOME AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A FRAMEWORK STRUCTURE OF A PIECE OF HOME AUTOMATION EQUIPMENT | ||
Former [2019/41] | ARMATURE D'UN EQUIPEMENT DOMOTIQUE ET PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION D'UNE ARMATURE D'UN EQUIPEMENT DOMOTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 21.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US874311 (DORAN JULIA [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [XI]EP0860615 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [X] 1,4-6,12 * abstract * [I] 2,3,7-11,13,14; | [XI]US2004056167 (VOGT WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1,5,11-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0026]; figures 2a,2b,2c * [I] 2-4,6,7; | [A]US2007187566 (PRICE CORY D [US]) [A] 2 * figure 21 *; | [XI]US2013284383 (FELDSTEIN GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,11,12 * abstract * [I] 13; | [A]DE202014007350U (CASIM GES FÜR RECHNERUNTERSTÜTZTE PRODUKTENTWICKLUNG UND PROZESSMAN MBH & CO DIENSTLEISTUNGS KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US874311 |