EP3833185 - WEED CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weeding Technologies Limited Unit 2, Westpoint Trading Estate Alliance Road London W3 0RA / GB | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWAN, Joe Haughton Design Ltd. Business Innovation Centre Staffordshire Technology Park Beaconside Stafford ST18 0AR / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Lee Haughton Design Ltd. Business Innovation Centre Staffordshire Technology Park Beaconside Stafford ST18 0AR / GB | 03 /
BALDUCCHI, Franck Weeding Technologies Ltd. Unit 2 Westpoint Trading Estate Alliance Road London W3 0RA / GB | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 17809342.3 | 28.11.2017 | [2021/24] | WO2017GB53587 | Priority number, date | GB20160020238 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: GB 201620238 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018100362 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833185 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01M21/04 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A01M21/04 (EP,GB);
A01M21/043 (US);
B05B7/00 (US);
B05B7/0018 (GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG | [2021/24] | English: | WEED CONTROL | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE LES MAUVAISES HERBES | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/52] | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 29.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 29.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 29.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2021 | Decision despatched | 29.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 29.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2021 | 30.11.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5575111 (RAJAMANNAN A H J [US]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * [I] 2-6,8-15; | [Y]WO03026414 (TINDALL DENIS WALTER [NZ], et al) [Y] 1-15* please view the section of the description: "Best modes to carry out the inveniton" This apparatus and method is particularly useful to enable better application of heat in places where application is difficult, for example dense swards and vegetation substantially above 200mm in height. The application is less confined by surface conditions and obstacles since the foam adheres to vertical surfaces and does not run off like liquids. The residence time of hot foam on target areas is greater than that of hot water. The evaporation rate of wet foams is less, resulting in longer contact with the target. Also, foams provide visual evidence of coverage of the application area. Faster and more long-lasting control of weeds is provided, compared to the known hot air foam method. *; | [Y]US2005116071 (RAJAMANNAN A H J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * |