EP3467581 - LIGHT-EMITTING ASSEMBLY FOR BACKLIGHT MODULE, BACKLIGHT MODULE AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states K-Tronics (Suzhou) Technology Co., Ltd. No.1700 Zhongshan North Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Wujiang District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215200 / CN | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Zhifu No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Li No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
XI, Daowen No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17809663.2 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017CN86879 | Priority number, date | CN201610403665 | 07.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610403665 | [2019/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017211224 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467581 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3467581 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, G02F1/1335 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G02F1/133603 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133606 (EP,CN);
G02B19/0014 (EP,US);
G02B19/0061 (EP,US);
G02B27/0955 (US);
G02B27/0977 (US);
G02F1/133605 (US);
G02F1/133608 (US);
G02F1/133611 (EP);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
G02F1/133607 (EP);
G02F1/1351 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G02F1/13357 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSMODUL, RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSMODUL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/25] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING ASSEMBLY FOR BACKLIGHT MODULE, BACKLIGHT MODULE AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2019/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT DESTINÉ À UN MODULE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE, MODULE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/15] |
Former [2019/15] | LICHTEMITTIERENDE ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN HINTERGRUNDBELEUCHTUNGSMODUL, RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSMODUL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2018 | Translation filed | 12.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015219966 (SONG SI JOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0071] - [0093] - [ 122] - [0128]; figures 1-16 *; | [XI]US2016004123 (TANABE HARUMI [JP]) [X] 1,3-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0036]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2; | [A]EP3021160 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0129] - [0143]; figures 19-23 * | International search | [A]CN101515612 (HELIO CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2010012944 (CHO AN-THUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-16* , the whole document *; | [A]CN102494264 (AU OPTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN203431583U (SICHUAN CHANGHONG PHOTOELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN104534417 (ANHUI COREACH ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1-16 * , description, paragraphs [0002]-[0034], and figures 1-8 *; | [A]CN204404074U (CHENGDU HENGKUN OPTICAL ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN105892149 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-16 * , claims 1-15, description, paragraphs [0022]-[0055], and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN205665499U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-16 * , claims 1-15, description, paragraphs [0022]-[0055], and figures 1-4 * |