EP3453900 - BOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aoyama Seisakusho Co., Ltd. 1-8 Takahashi Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0198 / JP | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKAMI, Takashi c/o AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD. 1-8, Takahashi Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0198 / JP | 02 /
KOGA, Kazuhiro c/o AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD. 1-8, Takahashi Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0198 / JP | 03 /
MATSUNAMI, Shigeki c/o AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD. 1-8, Takahashi Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0198 / JP | 04 /
FUJIMOTO, Yukinori c/o AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD. 1-8, Takahashi Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0198 / JP | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17809919.8 | 16.03.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017JP10733 | Priority number, date | JP20160112388 | 06.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016112388 | [2019/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212735 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453900 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/30, F16B33/02, F16B39/284 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
F16B39/30 (EP,KR,US);
F16B33/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16B39/284 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | BOLZEN | [2019/11] | English: | BOLT | [2019/11] | French: | BOULON | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2018 | Translation filed | 06.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 05.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2408061 (TOMOYASU YOSHIOKI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4782688 (KAWASHIMA MASAO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0783224 (JUSTY KK) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]JPH07197924 (JUSTY KK, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6135689 (MATSUNAMI SHIGEKI [JP]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [X]JP2015187493 (TSUJISAKA HIROSHI) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028]; figures 1,2,21,22 *; | [X]US2016091012 (KONDO KOTA [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0031] - [0061]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [XY]JP2015187493 (TSUJISAKA HIROSHI) [X] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0027] to [0039], [0063]; fig. 1 to 6, 21 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-3; | [Y]JP2002106539 (ISHIMORI YUSAKU) [Y] 2-3 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0022]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2002/0044850 A1 paragraphs [0022] to [0026]; fig. 1 to 2 & EP 1193408 A1 *; | [Y]JP3194854U (Iwata Bolt Co., Ltd.) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0018]; fig. 1 to 2 & CN 105987061 A *; | [Y]JP2010096199 (KATO RASHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0016]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0663923U (Matsuhiro OKUMOTO) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0019]; fig. 4 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2002122114 |