EP3463838 - TIRE BUILDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC 200 4th Avenue South Nashville, TN 37201 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARA, Jason, J. 4047 Clovercroft Rd. Franklin Tennessee 37067 / US | 02 /
BRASHER, Phillip, T., Jr. 253 Summit Ridge Drive Nashville Tennessee 37215 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17810676.1 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US29605 | Priority number, date | US201662347042P | 07.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662347042 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017213763 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3463838 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/30, B29D30/26, B29D30/42 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
B29D30/26 (EP,US);
B29D30/3007 (US);
B29D30/30 (EP);
B29D2030/421 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B29D30/30, B29D30/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | REIFENAUFBAUMASCHINE | [2019/15] | English: | TIRE BUILDING MACHINE | [2019/15] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION DE PNEUS | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 08.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012099458 (VMI HOLLAND BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* Abstracts;; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]US2016136908 (VAN TIENEN LUUK [NL]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0056] , [0059] , [0064] , [0068] - [0072]; figures 1-11,16B * [I] 2-10,12-15 | International search | [A]EP0585647 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-23* See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]US5693176 (TSUTSUMI TERUHISA [JP]) [A] 1-23 * See column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 49 and figures 1-4. *; | [A]JP2001212889 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0026] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2004154727 (WEISSERT JAMES THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0057] and figures 1-9. *; | [X]US2016136908 (VAN TIENEN LUUK [NL]) [X] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0056], [0065], [0075]-[0083], claims 30, 40, and figures 12A-18B. * |