EP3465449 - MEMORY PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716-9632 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Robert M. 9000 Deerland Grove Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US | 02 /
HALL, James A. Jr. 10256 W. Milclay Court Boise, Idaho 83704 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
WALKER, Robert M. 9000 Deerland Grove Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27615 / US | ||
02 /
HALL, James A., Jr. 10256 W. Milclay Court Boise Idaho 83704 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/15] | Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17810712.4 | 25.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US34487 | Priority number, date | US201662346201P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662346201 P | US201615182821 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: US201615182821 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017213876 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465449 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3465449 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16, G06F3/06, G06F12/02 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/0605 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F13/1673 (CN,KR);
G06F12/0246 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0656 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0659 (CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0683 (CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0685 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F2212/261 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F2212/7203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F2212/7207 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G06F13/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERPROTOKOLL | [2019/15] | English: | MEMORY PROTOCOL | [2019/15] | French: | PROTOCOLE DE MÉMOIRE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4467411 (FRY SCOTT M [US], et al); | [A]EP2863316 (MEMBLAZE TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [X]US5574944 (STAGER GARY B [US]); | [A]US2003110322 (WOLRICH GILBERT [US], et al); | [X]US2004260908 (MALIK AFZAL M [US], et al); | [Y]US2008189452 (MERRY DAVID E [US], et al); | [Y]US2009006787 (DE SOUZA JORGE CAMPELLO [US], et al); | [Y]US2009276556 (HUANG HSIANG-I [TW]); | [Y]US2011320651 (POUBLAN SERGE HENRI [GB], et al); | [XY]US2015052318 (WALKER ROBERT M [US]); | [A]US2015331638 (ZALTSMAN ETAI [IL], et al) | by applicant | US4467411 |