EP3464384 - FUSION PROTEIN CONSTRUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MRKSICH, Milan 552 North Vine Street Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | 02 /
MODICA, Justin, A. 1756 W. North 3R Chicago, IL 60622 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17810861.9 | 06.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US36160 | Priority number, date | US201662346369P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662346369 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017214151 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464384 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61P19/02, C07K19/00, C07K16/46, C12N15/62, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, C07K16/32 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
C07K16/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/18 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y301/01074 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
C07K2317/94 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/61 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y201/01037 (EP,US);
C12Y301/21002 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01021 (EP,US);
C12Y304/11018 (EP,US);
C12Y304/24024 (EP,US);
C12Y305/02006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | C07K19/00, C07K16/46, C12N15/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | FUSIONSPROTEINKONSTRUKT | [2019/15] | English: | FUSION PROTEIN CONSTRUCT | [2019/15] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE PROTÉINES DE FUSION | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - DOMINIK ERHART ET AL, "Chemical Development of Intracellular Protein Heterodimerizers", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY., GB, (20130401), vol. 20, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2013.03.010, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 549 - 557, XP055530533 [X] 1-3,10-13 * figures 1, 3, 4, 6 * [I] 4-9,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2013.03.010 | [XI] - Ruben Cal ET AL, "Development of novel chemical inducers of dimerization to regulate proteins with high spatial and temporal precision", doi:10.5451/unibas-006422144, (20150101), URL: https://edoc.unibas.ch/37682/1/Thesis-corrected.pdf, XP055572105 [X] 1-3,10-13 * the whole document * [I] 4-9,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5451/unibas-006422144 | International search | [Y]US2003167524 (ROOIJEN GIJS VAN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-5, 74-78 * para [0030], [0033], [0034], [0035], [0044], [0065], [0092], [0111], [0114] *; | [Y]US2015369816 (MRKSICH MILAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 74-78* para [0039], [0041], [0060], [0065], [0066] * |