EP3465075 - CHIRPED LASER DISPERSION SPECTROSCOPY SENSITIVITY BOOSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Princeton University 87 Prospect Avenue 3rd Floor Princeton, NJ 08544 / US | For all designated states Plant, Genevieve 160 N Harrison Street Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | For all designated states Chen, Yifeng 139 Spruce Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | For all designated states Wysocki, Gerard 58 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANT, Genevieve 58 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yifeng 58 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
WYSOCKI, Gerard 58 Longview Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17810865.0 | 06.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US36164 | Priority number, date | US201662345953P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662345953 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017214155 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465075 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01J3/45, G01N21/25, G02F1/35, G01J3/433 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G01J3/433 (EP,US);
G01N21/45 (EP,US);
G01B9/02 (US);
G01J3/4338 (EP);
G01N21/59 (US);
G02F1/35 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G01B9/02, G01J3/45, G01N21/25, G02F1/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | EMPFINDLICHKEITSVERSTÄRKER FÜR GECHIRPTE LASERDISPERSIONSSPEKTROSKOPIE | [2019/15] | English: | CHIRPED LASER DISPERSION SPECTROSCOPY SENSITIVITY BOOSTER | [2019/15] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE SENSIBILITÉ DE LA SPECTROSCOPIE À DISPERSION LASER DE FLUCTUATION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012021943 (NEWSOUTH INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2012129089 (UNIV VIRGINIA PATENT FOUND [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US5357574 (WHITECAR JOHN E [US]) [Y] 8, 9, 17, 18, 26, 27, 32, 33 * entire document *; | [Y]EP1166469 (CELERICA LTD [IS]) [Y] 6, 15, 24, 30 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013010302 (SHARMA UTKARSH [US], et al) [Y] 10, 19, 28, 34* entire document *; | [XY]US2015159990 (PLUSQUELLIC DAVID F [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 7, 11-14, 16, 20-23, 25, 29, 31 * entire document * [Y] 6, 8-10, 15, 17-19, 24, 26-28, 30, 32-34 | by applicant | WO2012129089 |