EP3714644 - NODES AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING AND ENABLING A SYNCHRONIZED TIME REFERENCE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/17] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Junghoon 109-1O1 Hyangchon-Hyundai 5th Gwin-ro 213 Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14071 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyunsoo Hyangchon APT 303 Dong 602 Ho Pyeongchon-daero 180 beon-gil Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14071 / KR | 03 /
OLOFSSON, Mikael 11 rue du Coteau 90850 ESSERT / FR | [2022/17] |
Former [2021/18] | 01 /
KIM, Junghoon 109-1O1 Hyangchon-Hyundai 5th Gwin-ro 213 Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14071 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Hyunsoo Hyangchon APT 303 Dong 602 Ho Pyeongchon-daero 180 beon-gil Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14071 / KR | |||
03 /
Olofsson, Mikael 11 rue du Coteau 90850 ESSERT / FR | |||
Former [2020/40] | 01 /
KIM, Junghoon 109-1O1 Hyangchon-Hyundai 5th Gwin-ro 213 Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14071 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Hyunsoo Hyangchon APT 303 Dong 602 Ho Pyeongchon-daero 180 beon-gil Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14071 / KR | |||
03 /
OLOFSSON, Mikael 15b rue Parmentier 90000 Belfort / FR | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 17811389.0 | 20.11.2017 | [2020/40] | WO2017SE51151 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098898 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714644 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714644 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
H04W56/00 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (US);
H04B7/18513 (US);
H04W56/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG UND AKTIVIERUNG EINER SYNCHRONIZIERDEN ZEITREFERENZ IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2021/51] | English: | NODES AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING AND ENABLING A SYNCHRONIZED TIME REFERENCE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2020/40] | French: | NOEUDS ET RÉSEAUX POUR DÉTERMINER ET PERMETTRE UNE RÉFÉRENCE TEMPORELLE SYNCHRONISÉE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2021/51] |
Former [2020/40] | KNOTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND AKTIVIERUNG EINER SYNCHRONISIERTEN ZEITREFERENZ IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | ||
Former [2020/40] | NOEUDS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER ET DE PERMETTRE UNE RÉFÉRENCE DE TEMPS SYNCHRONISÉE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2017 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | TR | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | IE | 20.11.2022 | LU | 20.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
MK | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004047307 (YOON CHANG-JUNE [US], et al) [A] 1-26* paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2005037786 (EDGE STEPHEN WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0012] *; | [X]WO2015057156 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-26 * page 11, line 16 - page 13, line 23; figures 5-11 *; | [X]WO2016181198 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1-26 * column 3, lines 10-13 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 23 * * page 29, lines 4-12; figures 18-20 * |