EP3554579 - IMMUNOADSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states uniQure IP B.V. Paasheuvelweg 25 1105 BP Amsterdam / NL | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERREIRA, Valerie c/o uniQure IP B.V. Paasheuvelweg 25 1105 BP Amsterdam / NL | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17811974.9 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017EP83154 | Priority number, date | EP20160204806 | 16.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16204806 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018109207 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554579 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61K48/00, C12N15/86 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
A61K48/0083 (EP,US);
A61K48/0075 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61M1/3486 (EP,US);
A61M1/362 (EP,US);
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
A61M5/14 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | IMMUNADSORPTION | [2019/43] | English: | IMMUNOADSORPTION | [2019/43] | French: | IMMUNOADSORPTION | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 11.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0117537 (CANJI INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-26 * * examples 1-4 *; | [X] - RAHMAN A ET AL, "Specific depletion of human anti-adenovirus antibodies facilitates transduction in an in vivo model for systemic gene therapy", MOLECULAR THERAPY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20010501), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1006/MTHE.2001.0316, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 768 - 778, XP002977532 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 769, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 776, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 777, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mthe.2001.0316 | [X] - CHICOINE L G ET AL, "Plasmapheresis Eliminates the Negative Impact of AAV Antibodies on Microdystrophin Gene Expression Following Vascular Delivery", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (201402), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 338 - 347, XP002770125 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2013.244 | [X] - CHEN Y ET AL, "PRE-EXISTENT ADENOVIRUS ANTIBODY INHIBITS SYSTEMIC TOXICITY AND ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY OF CN706 IN THE NUDE MOUSE LNCAP XENOGRAFT MODEL: IMPLICATIONS AND PROPOSALS FOR HUMAN THERAPY", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC. PUBLISHERS, US, (20000720), vol. 11, no. 11, doi:10.1089/10430340050083289, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 1553 - 1567, XP000990820 [X] 12,13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430340050083289 | [X] - MAJOWICZ A. ET AL, "Successful in vivo re-administration of AAV with the use of two-step AAV injection", MOLECULAR THERAPY, vol. 24, no. Supplement 1, (201605), Database accession no. 701, page S277, URL: http://www.cell.com/molecular-therapy-family/molecular-therapy/pdf/S1525-0016%2816%2933509-2.pdf, (20180110), XP002777177 [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [XP] - ANNA MAJOWICZ ET AL, "Successful Repeated Hepatic Gene Delivery in Mice and Non-human Primates Achieved by Sequential Administration of AAV5 ch and AAV1", MOLECULAR THERAPY, US, (20170801), vol. 25, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.05.003, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 1831 - 1842, XP055439711 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.05.003 | by applicant | WO0100220 | WO0192551 | WO2007046703 | WO2007148971 | WO2009014445 | WO2009104964 | - SELOT et al., Current Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 14, pages 1072 - 1082 | - BRIMBLE et al., Expert Opin Biol Ther, (20160000), vol. 16, no. l, pages 79 - 92 | - BOUTIN et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20100000), vol. 21, pages 704 - 712 | - CORTI et al., Mol Ther - Meth Clin Dev, (20140000), vol. 1, page 14033 | - MINGOZZI et al., Mol Ther, vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1410 - 1416 | - MCINTOSH et al., Gene Ther, (20120000), vol. 19, pages 78 - 85 | - CHICOINE et al., Mol Ther, (20140000), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 338 - 347 | - HURLBUT et al., Mol Ther, (20100000), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 1983 - 1984 | - PAN et al., J. of Virology, (19990000), vol. 73, pages 3410 - 3417 | - CLARK et al., Human Gene Therapy, (19990000), vol. 10, pages 1031 - 1039 | - WANG et al., Methods Mol. Biol., (20110000), vol. 807, pages 361 - 404 | - Methods, (20020000), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 146 - 157 | - XIAO et al., J. Virol., (19960000), vol. 70, pages 8098 - 8108 | - FLOTTE et al., Gene Ther., (19950000), vol. 2, pages 29 - 37 | - URABE et al., Human Gene Therapy, (20020000), vol. 13, no. 16, pages 1935 - 1943 | - KOHLBRENNER et al., Molecular Therapy, (20050000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 1217 - 1225 | - URABE et al., Journal of Virology, (20060000), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 1874 - 1885 | - SCHAFFER; MAHESHRI, Proceedings of the 26th Annual International Conference of the IEEE EMBS San Francisco, (20040901), pages 3520 - 3523 | - ASURI et al., Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 329 - 3389 | - LISOWSKI et al., Nature, (20140000), vol. 506, no. 7488, pages 382 - 386 | - CHIORINI et al., J. of Virology, (19990000), vol. 73, no. 2, pages 1309 - 1319 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AF085716 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NC 001401.2 | - HSIEH et al., Biochemical Biophys. Res. Commun., (19950000), vol. 214, pages 910 - 917 | - KIM et al., PLoS One, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 4, page el8556 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 915 - 919 | - DATI et al., Eur J Clin Chem Clin Biochem., (19960000), vol. 34, pages 517 - 20 | - ITO et al., Ann Clin Biochem, (20090000), vol. 46, pages 508 - 510 | - SPRENGER et al., J Clin Apher., (19870000), vol. 3, pages 185 - 190 | - Mol Ther., vol. 4, no. 4, pages 372 - 4 |