EP3471934 - A THERMALLY MODIFIED WOOD PRODUCT AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAID PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄLLANDER, Björn Djörmovägen 3 785 61 Djurås / SE | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17812857.5 | 14.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017IB53522 | Priority number, date | SE20160050839 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: SE 1650839 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017216734 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471934 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B27K5/00, B27K3/00, F26B5/04 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B27K5/0085 (EP,SE);
B27K5/009 (SE,US);
B27K3/00 (RU);
B27K3/0214 (US);
B27K5/00 (RU);
F26B2210/16 (US);
F26B5/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | B27K5/00, B27K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | WÄRMEMODIFIZIERTES HOLZPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES BESAGTEN PRODUKTS | [2019/17] | English: | A THERMALLY MODIFIED WOOD PRODUCT AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAID PRODUCT | [2019/17] | French: | PRODUIT EN BOIS THERMIQUEMENT MODIFIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CE PRODUIT | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 26.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN102581897 (RES INST WOOD IND CAF) [X] 1-5,7-9,13,14 * page 2: line 7-8, line 11-12, line 15-16 * [I] 12; | [X]CN105479574 (ANHUI GUANYI BAGS CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,10,14 * page 1: line 18, line 32-33, line 38 *; | [XI]US2014124354 (PAGNOZZI ERNESTO [IT]) [X] 1-5,7,11,14 * paragraph: [0047], [0103]; * [I] 12 | [X] - MICHIEL J. BOONSTRA ET AL, "Strength properties of thermally modified softwoods and its relation to polymeric structural Wood constituents", ANNALS OF FOREST SCIENCE, FR, (20071001), vol. 64, no. 7, doi:10.1051/forest:2007048, ISSN 1286-4560, pages 679 - 690, XP055447908 [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph: 2.1; table: II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/forest:2007048 | International search | [X]EP0922918 (STELLAC OY [FI]) [X] 1-6 * ; Paragraphs [0012]-[0013], [0018]-[0019] *; | [X]US4377040 (GIEBELER EBERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * ; column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 6; column 2, line 16 - column 2, line 17; claims *; | [X]CN101069972 (ZHEJIANG FORESTRY COLLEGE [CN]) [X] 1-6 * , WPI abstract, Retrieved from WPI database *; | [X] - BOONSTRA et al., "Strength properties of thermally modified softwoods and its relation to polymeric structural Wood constituents", Ann. For. Sci., (20070000), vol. 64, no. 7, pages 679 - 690, XP055447908 [X] 1-6 * ; abstract; Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/forest:2007048 | [X] - PONCSAK S et al., "Improvement of the heat treatment of Jack pine (Pinus banksiana) using Thermo Wood technology", Eur. J. Wood Prod., (20110000), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 281 - 286, XP055447910 [X] 1-6 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00107-010-0426-x | [A] - SANDBERG D et al., "Thermo-hydro and thermo-hydro- mechanical Wood processing: An opportunity for future environmentally friendly wood products", Wood Material Science and Engineering, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 64 - 88, XP055447912 [A] 1-14 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/17480272.2012.751935 |