EP3402146 - PHASE COMPENSATION DEVICE, PHASE COMPENSATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32, Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph And Telephone Corporation 5-1 Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Etsushi c/o NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32 Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | 02 /
NOUCHI, Hiroyuki c/o NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32 Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | 03 /
ONUMA, Yasuharu c/o NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32 Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | 04 /
TAKAMUKU, Tomohiro c/o NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32 Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | 05 /
OYAMA, Katsuichi c/o NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32 Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | 06 /
TAKEI, Kazuhito c/o NTT Electronics Corporation 1-32 Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | 07 /
TOMIZAWA, Masahito C/O NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 08 /
KISAKA, Yoshiaki C/O NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 09 /
YOSHIDA, Mitsuteru C/O NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 10 /
NAKAMURA, Masanori C/O NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Parker, Andrew James, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/46] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17813006.8 | 13.04.2017 | [2018/46] | WO2017JP15195 | Priority number, date | JP20160120841 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016120841 | [2018/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017217100 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402146 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3402146 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/01, H04B10/61, H04L27/38, H04L27/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
H04L27/3836 (EP,US);
H04B10/6164 (US);
H04B10/61 (EP,US);
H04B10/615 (US);
H04B10/6165 (US);
H04L27/01 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | H04L27/01, H04B10/61, H04L27/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHASENKOMPENSATIONSVORRICHTUNG, PHASENKOMPENSATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/46] | English: | PHASE COMPENSATION DEVICE, PHASE COMPENSATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2018/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE PHASE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMPENSATION DE PHASE ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2018 | Translation filed | 08.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2017 | AL | 07.10.2020 | AT | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | IT | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | NL | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | IE | 13.04.2021 | LU | 13.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009245403 (ZHANG HONGLIANG [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0038] , [0040] , [0041] , [0051] , [0053]; figure 5 * [I] 5,6,8; | [AD]EP2779486 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * figures 3,1 *; | [A]WO2015072515 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP2942917 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-8* figures 1,20 *; | [P]US2016323091 (INOUE TAKASHI [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0002] , [0175]; figure 15 * | International search | [A]JP2012520614 (Tyco Electronics Subsea Communications LLC) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0010], [0016] to [0022]; fig. 3 to 4 & US 2010/0232805 A1 paragraphs [0015], [0026] to [0034]; fig. 3 to 4 & WO 2010/104785 A1 & CN 102349248 A *; | [A]WO2014126132 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0035] to [0054]; fig. 4 to 9 & US 2015/0372766 A1 paragraphs [0069] to [0090]; fig. 4 to 9 & EP 2942917 A1 *; | [A] - MAGARINI, MAURIZIO et al., "Pilot-Symbols-Aided Carrier-Phase Recovery for 100-G PM-QPSK Digital Coherent Receivers", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20120000), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 739 - 741, XP011440747 [A] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2012.2187439 |