EP3473998 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, OBSERVATION SYSTEM, OBSERVATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Suguru c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
OHASHI, Takeshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
MATSUI, Naofumi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
ONUMA, Tomoya c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17813083.7 | 18.05.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017JP18654 | Priority number, date | JP20160119214 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016119214 | [2019/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017217180 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473998 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, C12M1/34, C12N5/075, C12N5/076, G06T1/00, C12M3/00, C12M1/36 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
C12M21/06 (EP,US);
G06T7/0016 (US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US);
C12M41/48 (EP,US);
G01J5/025 (US);
G01N21/17 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (EP,US);
H04N13/261 (US);
G01J2005/0077 (US);
G06T2207/30024 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | G01N21/17, C12M1/34, C12N5/075, C12N5/076, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BEOBACHTUNGSSYSTEM, BEOBACHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2019/17] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, OBSERVATION SYSTEM, OBSERVATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2019/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME D'OBSERVATION, PROCÉDÉ D'OBSERVATION ET PROGRAMME | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2018 | Translation filed | 29.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 11.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2012095627 ; | [Y]US5989835 (DUNLAY R TERRY [US], et al) [Y] 3,7 * column 6, paragraph 2 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 21 *; | [XY]JP2012095627 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,4,8-10 * [0008]-[0009],[0030],[0042],[0044], [0064]-[0069] * [Y] 3,7; | [X]JP2015223174 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1,2,5,9,10; | [A]US2016161394 (MATSUBARA KENTA [JP]) [A] 1-10* [0012]-[0014],[0021]-[0022],[0044]-[0049] *; | [XP]EP3150693 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5,9,10 * [0097]-[0100] *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 40, Database accession no. 2012-F96423, XP002791642 & JP2012095627 A 20120524 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,4,8-10 * abstract * [Y] 3,7 | International search | [Y]JP2011017620 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 3, 7, 8* , claims; paragraphs [0002], [0066] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2012095627 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1, 4, 5, 9, 10 * , claims; paragraphs [0003], [0005], [0007], [0014] (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 3, 6-8; | [Y]JP2013502233 (The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University) [Y] 2, 6 * , claims 28 to 30; paragraphs [0049] to [0051], [0056] & US 2011/0092762 A1 & WO 2011/025736 A1 claims 28 to 30; 0084 to 0087, 0091 & EP 2615460 A1 & KR 10-2012-0066023 A & CN 104293646 A *; | [XY]JP2015223174 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1, 4, 5, 9, 10 * , claim 15; paragraphs [0002], [0098] & US 2017/0073630 A1 claim 17; 0005, 0107 & EP 3150693 A1 * [Y] 2, 3, 6-8 |