EP3470109 - THERAPEUTIC DEVICE EMPLOYING ENDOSCOPE-INTERWORKING ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea University Research and Business Foundation 145, Anam-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02841 / KR | [2021/32] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Korea University Research and Business Foundation 145, Anam-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02841 / KR | ||
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states The Standard Co. Ltd. 120, Gunpocheomdansaneop 2-ro Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 15880 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea University Research and Business Foundation 145 Anam-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02841 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seong-Nam 214-113 171 Sinbanpo-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06509 / KR | 02 /
CHUN, Hoon-Jai 21, Daesagwan-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02822 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Hyuk Soon No.501, 13, Yeoksam-ro 64-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06200 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seung Han 64, Inchon-ro 17ga-gil Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02843 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Eun-sun 132-803, 1218, Yangjae-daero Songpa-gu Seoul 05649 / KR | 06 /
KEUM, Bora 208-1310, 150, Samseong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06288 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Jae Min 104-501, 221, Seolleung-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06276 / KR | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17813583.6 | 14.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017KR06193 | Priority number, date | KR20160074045 | 14.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160074045 | [2019/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017217760 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470109 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3470109 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, A61N1/05, A61B1/00, A61B5/053, A61B1/07, A61B1/04, A61B18/00, A61B18/12, A61B18/14, A61B1/018 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61N1/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00137 (KR);
A61B1/00165 (KR);
A61B1/042 (KR);
A61B1/044 (EP,US);
A61B1/046 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (KR,US);
A61B18/00 (KR,US);
A61B18/12 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (US);
A61B5/053 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/0416 (US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61N1/0507 (KR);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00494 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00613 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | A61N1/32, A61N1/05, A61B1/00, A61B5/053, A61B1/07, A61B1/04, A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ENDOSKOPVERNETZENDER ELEKTRODE | [2019/16] | English: | THERAPEUTIC DEVICE EMPLOYING ENDOSCOPE-INTERWORKING ELECTRODE | [2019/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF THÉRAPEUTIQUE UTILISANT UNE ÉLECTRODE D'INTERFONCTIONNEMENT D'ENDOSCOPE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2018 | Translation filed | 14.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 20.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2017 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 14.06.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.06.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.06.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6235023 (LEE KEE S [US], et al) [I] 5-10 * abstract * * column 4, lines 5-60 * * column 5, lines 35-60 *; | [A]US7025765 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007232871 (SINOFSKY EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US7422585 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 10 * * column 9, lines 25-41 * * column 22, lines 11-47 * * column 23, lines 33-56 *; | [A]US2011160514 (LONG GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014303452 (GHAFFARI ROOZBEH [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - AKAHORI H ET AL, "Tube shape piezoelectric 2D microscanner for minimally invasive laser treatment", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE, US, (20050130), doi:10.1109/MEMSYS.2005.1453871, ISBN 978-0-7803-8732-4, pages 76 - 79, XP010811663 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.2005.1453871 | [A] - ESASHI M ET AL, "Biomedical Microsystems for Minimally Invasive Diagnosis and Treatment", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20040101), vol. 92, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2003.820545, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 98 - 114, XP011105292 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2003.820545 | International search | [XY]US6235023 (LEE KEE S [US], et al) [X] 5-7, 9, 10 * See claims 1-19; column 4, lines 5-60; column 5, lines 35-60; figures 1-3. * [Y] 1-4, 8; | [Y]US2007232871 (SINOFSKY EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 8 * See claims 1-22; paragraphs [0013]-[0015]; figures 1-4. *; | [Y]KR101198690B (WOMANS CARE CO., LTD.) [Y] 3 * See claim 1; paragraphs [0028]-[0036]; figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2014081255 (JOHNSON THEODORE C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20150115223 (ONE MEDTECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* See the entire document. * |