EP3526620 - ADAPTIVE SIGNAL DETECTION AND SYNTHESIS ON TRACE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LI-COR, INC. 4647 Superior Street Lincoln, NE 68504 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMPHREY, Patrick G. Patrick G. Humphrey 4647 Superior Street Lincoln, Nebraska 68504 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17813992.9 | 14.06.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US37393 | Priority number, date | US201615185983 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: US201615185983 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017218628 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526620 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/02, G06K9/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
G06F18/2134 (EP,US);
G06F2218/02 (EP,US);
G06F2218/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | G01S1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE SIGNALDETEKTION UND -SYNTHESE BEI VERFOLGUNGSDATEN | [2019/34] | English: | ADAPTIVE SIGNAL DETECTION AND SYNTHESIS ON TRACE DATA | [2019/34] | French: | DÉTECTION ET SYNTHÈSE DE SIGNAL ADAPTATIF SUR DES DONNÉES DE TRACE | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - SHOKO ARAKI ET AL, "Blind sparse source separation for unknown number of sources using Gaussian mixture model fitting with Dirichlet prior", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2009. ICASSP 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090419), ISBN 978-1-4244-2353-8, pages 33 - 36, XP031459159 [I] 1-18 * abstract * * Section 3; Section 4;; figures 1, 2; tables 1, 2 * | [I] - FIGUEIREDO M A T ET AL, "Unsupervised learning of finite mixture models", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (200203), vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.1109/34.990138, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 381 - 396, XP011369540 [I] 1-18 * abstract * * Section 2; Section 4.2; Section 5.1.1; Section 5.2; Section 5.3;; figures 3, 5, 7, 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.990138 | [I] - PERVEZ AFFAN ET AL, A Componentwise Simulated Annealing EM Algorithm for Mixtures, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FINANCIAL CRYPTOGRAPHY AND DATA SECURITY; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 287 - 294, (20151103), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047413784 [I] 1-18 * Section 3; Section 4; Section 5.1;; figures 1, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-24489-1_25 | [A] - ANDRZEJ POLANSKI ET AL, "Signal Partitioning Algorithm for Highly Efficient Gaussian Mixture Modeling in Mass Spectrometry", PLOS ONE, (20150731), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0134256, pages 1 - 19, XP055653833 [A] 1-18 * Section Methods;;; figures 1, 2, 4, 7, 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0134256 | International search | [A]US5832119 (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US]) [A] 1-27* , entire document *; | [A]US6018312 (HAWORTH DAVID PATRICK [GB]) [A] 1-27 * , entire document *; | [XY]US2004098208 (REEVE RUSSELL [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 5-10, 12, 14-19, 21, 23-27 * , entire document * [Y] 2, 4, 11, 13, 20, 22; | [A]US2006178849 (MAIER CHRISTOPH H [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * , entire document *; | [A]US2007150213 (KIM SANG Y [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2008306694 (IZMAILOV ALEXANDRE M [CA], et al) [Y] 4, 13, 22 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2011267340 (KRAUS MARTIN F G [DE], et al) [Y] 2, 11, 20 * , entire document * |