EP3471763 - TUBERCULOSIS COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF TREATING OR PREVENTING TUBERCULOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International AIDS Vaccine Initiative, Inc. 125 Broad Street, 9th Floor New York, NY 10004 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANANTHA, Ravi P. 1405 Research Boulevard Suite 300 Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Thomas G. 1405 Research Boulevard Suite 300 Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | 03 /
BONAVIA, Aurelio M. 1405 Research Boulevard Suite 300 Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17814150.3 | 16.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US37824 | Priority number, date | US201662350837P | 16.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662350837 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017218867 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471763 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/04, C07K14/35, C07K19/00, A61K39/00, A61P31/06 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A61K39/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/35 (US);
A61P31/06 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | A61K39/04, C07K14/35, C07K19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | TUBERKULOSEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG VON TUBERKULOSE | [2019/17] | English: | TUBERCULOSIS COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF TREATING OR PREVENTING TUBERCULOSIS | [2019/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LUTTER CONTRE LA TUBERCULOSE ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT OU DE PRÉVENTION DE LA TUBERCULOSE | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 26.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011117133 (SHAFFERMAN AVIGDOR [IL], et al) [X] 9-15 * abstract, [0008], examples 1-5 and claims * [I] 1-8; | [I]US2014377300 (ANANTHA RAVI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract, [0005]-[0027], examples 1-5 and claims *; | [I] - YU LUO ET AL, "Fusion protein Ag85B-MPT64190-198-Mtb8.4 has higher immunogenicity than Ag85B with capacity to boost BCG-primed immunity against Mycobacterium tuberculosis in mice", VACCINE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20091001), vol. 27, no. 44, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.08.018, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 6179 - 6185, XP055676269 [I] 1-15 * abstract, p.6180 the paragraph bridging the left- to the right-hand column - right-hand column fourth full paragraph, results and discussion, fig 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.08.018 | [I] - EDUARDO MARTINS DE SOUSA ET AL, "Immunogenicity of a Fusion Protein Containing Immunodominant Epitopes of Ag85C, MPT51, and HspX from Mycobacterium tuberculosis in Mice and Active TB Infection", PLOS ONE, (20121025), vol. 7, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0047781, page e47781, XP055353284 [I] 1-15 * abstract, p. 3 left-hand column fourth full paragraph - p. 4 left-hand column line 4, results and discussion, and fig. 2-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0047781 | International search | [YA]US2011117133 (SHAFFERMAN AVIGDOR [IL], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-10 * . Especially para [0008], [0045] * [A] 11, 12; | [Y]US2012003256 (HAN HUILING [US], et al) [Y] 1-3* . Especially para [0124], [0178], SEQ ID NOs: 7, 19 *; | [YA]US2014377300 (ANANTHA RAVI [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-10 * . Especially para [0007], [0069], [0070], [0071], [0126], SEQ ID NOs: 4, 15, 19, 21, 37, 39, 42, 64 * [A] 11, 12 |