EP3471989 - INTERLOCK CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Predictive Safety Srp, Inc. 6555 S. Kenton Street Suite 310 Centennial, Colorado 80111 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWLES, Henry M. 1331 St. Charles Street Alameda, California 94501 / US | 02 /
WICHMANN, Marcus T. 6076 Biscay Street Auroro, Colorado 80016 / US | 03 /
CHAMBERLIN, Darren B. 2367 The Northern Road Mulgoa, New South Wales 2745 / AU | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | O'Connor, Michael Donal O'Connor Intellectual Property Suite 207, Q House Furze Road Sandyford, Dublin 18 / IE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17814238.6 | 16.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US38029 | Priority number, date | US201662351665P | 17.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662351665 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017218993 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471989 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3471989 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/048 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06398 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/1112 (US);
A61B5/14542 (US);
A61B5/16 (US);
A61B5/162 (US);
A61B5/165 (US);
A61B5/18 (US);
A61B5/4064 (EP,US);
A61B5/4088 (US);
A61B5/6898 (US);
G06F21/36 (US);
G06F3/04812 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1091 (EP,US);
G07C9/20 (US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US);
G07C9/30 (US);
G08B21/02 (US);
G08B21/06 (EP,US);
G09B5/065 (US);
G09B7/00 (US);
G09B7/10 (US);
G16H10/20 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
A61B2503/20 (US);
A61B2560/0247 (US);
A61B2562/0204 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/4857 (EP,US);
H04W12/63 (US);
H04W12/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | B60K28/06, A61B5/04, A61B5/18, G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/17] | English: | INTERLOCK CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/17] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VERROUILLAGE | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 13.08.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.01.2023 | 24.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2002373288 (NEC COMPUTERTECHNO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]JP2004225514 (TIETECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *; | [I]JP2007056642 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2008138784 (ADLER MITCHELL L [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0047] *; | [XI]US2011281643 (RIOUX ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 * [I] 3-11,13-15; | [A]US2012278766 (MASSENGILL R KEMP [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0041]; claims 1, 30-35 *; | [I]US2014198061 (CHEN SHIH-NAN [TW]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024]; claims 1-6 *; | [I]CN104063925 (SUZHOU TIANMING INFORMATION SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2015007307 (GRIMES PATRICK M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0147] *; | [I]CN104808901 (GUANGDONG XIAOTIANCAI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0101] *; | [I]KR20150102282 (KANG PIL SUNG [KR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0040] *; | [I]KR20160001079 (UNIV SOONGSIL RES CONSORTIUM [KR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0098] *; | [I]CN105373716 (GUANGDONG XIAOTIANCAI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0111] * | International search | [Y]US2008043201 (TODD DAVID P [US]) [Y] 4, 13, 19-20 * ; paragraphs [0014], [0017], [0019]. *; | [XY]US2009024050 (JUNG EDWARD K Y [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-12, 14-18 * ; paragraphs [0375], [0391], [0392], [0463], [0471], [0477]. * [Y] 4, 13, 19-20; | [A]US2014223531 (OUTWATER CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document. * | Examination | US2011029902 | US2015095241 |