EP3476958 - COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | COPPER ALLOY, COPPER ALLOY INGOT, COPPER ALLOY SOLUTION FORMING MATERIAL, COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE | ||
[2023/47] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd. 3-4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd. 3-4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENAMI, Yuusuke c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Copper&Copper Alloy Development Center 1975-2 Shimoishitokami Kitamoto-shi Saitama 364-0022 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO, Toshio c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Copper&Copper Alloy Development Center 1975-2 Shimoishitokami Kitamoto-shi Saitama 364-0022 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMOTO, Hitoshi c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 3-2 Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | 04 /
OISHI, Keiichiro c/o Sambo Plant Mitsubishi Shindoh Co. Ltd. 8-374 Sambo-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0906 / JP | 05 /
SUGAHARA, Atsushi c/o Railway Technical Research Institute 8-38 Hikari-cho 2-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP | 06 /
YAMASHITA, Chikara c/o Railway Technical Research Institute 8-38 Hikari-cho 2-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP | 07 /
OHARA, Takuya c/o Railway Technical Research Institute 8-38 Hikari-cho 2-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP | [2023/49] |
Former [2019/18] | 01 /
ENAMI Yuusuke c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Copper&Copper Alloy Development Center 1975-2 Shimoishitokami Kitamoto-shi Saitama 364-0022 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKAMOTO Toshio c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Copper&Copper Alloy Development Center 1975-2 Shimoishitokami Kitamoto-shi Saitama 364-0022 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMOTO Hitoshi c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 3-2 Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | |||
04 /
OISHI Keiichiro c/o Sambo Plant Mitsubishi Shindoh Co. Ltd. 8-374 Sambo-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0906 / JP | |||
05 /
SUGAHARA Atsushi c/o Railway Technical Research Institute 8-38 Hikari-cho 2-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMASHITA Chikara c/o Railway Technical Research Institute 8-38 Hikari-cho 2-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP | |||
07 /
OHARA Takuya c/o Railway Technical Research Institute 8-38 Hikari-cho 2-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17815506.5 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017JP23164 | Priority number, date | JP20160124661 | 23.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016124661 | JP20170115427 | 12.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017115427 | [2019/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017222041 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476958 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/06, B22D11/00, C22F1/08, H01B1/02, B21B1/46, B21B13/22, B22D11/06, B22D11/12 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
C22C9/06 (EP,US);
B21C1/02 (US);
B22D11/004 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (US);
C22C9/02 (US);
C22C9/04 (US);
C22C9/05 (US);
C22F1/08 (EP,US);
H01B1/026 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | C22C9/06, C22C9/00, C22C9/02, C22C9/04, C22C9/05, H01B1/02, B22D11/00, B22D11/06, B22D11/108, B22D11/12, B22D35/00, C22F1/00, C22F1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | KUPFERLEGIERUNGSFAHRDRAHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KUPFERLEGIERUNGSFAHRDRAHTES | [2023/47] | English: | COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE | [2023/47] | French: | FIL DE TRACTION EN ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU FIL DE TRACTION EN ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE | [2023/47] |
Former [2019/18] | KUPFERLEGIERUNG, KUPFERLEGIERUNGSBLOCK, KUPFERLEGIERUNGSLÖSUNGSBILDUNGSMATERIAL, KUPFERLEGIERUNGSFAHRDRAHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KUPFERLEGIERUNGSFAHRDRAHT | ||
Former [2019/18] | COPPER ALLOY, COPPER ALLOY INGOT, COPPER ALLOY SOLUTION FORMING MATERIAL, COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING COPPER ALLOY TROLLEY WIRE | ||
Former [2019/18] | ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE, LINGOT D'ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE, MATÉRIAU DE FORMATION DE SOLUTION D'ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE, FIL DE TRACTION EN ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FIL DE TRACTION EN ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2018 | Translation filed | 20.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JPS63317635 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * * example E * [A] 2,9-12 [Y] 3 [I] 3-5; | [XAI]JP2001247923 (SANBO COPPER ALLOY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * * examples 134, 135, 146, 147; claim 1 * [A] 3,9-12 [I] 5; | [XA]JP2008255379 (KOBELCO & MAT COPPER TUBE INC) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * * example 7 * [A] 3,9-12; | [A]US2015136281 (NAKAMOTO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,9-12 * the whole document ** table 1, example 12 *; | [XDAYI]US2016122849 (TSUGAWA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [XD] 1,4 * the whole document * * paragraph [0102]; example 9; claim 1 * [A] 12 [Y] 3 [I] 2,5,9-11 | International search | [XA]JPS63317635 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * , claims; page 3, upper left column, line 15 to upper right column, line 1; page 3, lower right column, lines 2 to 10; table 1, symbol E (Family: none) * [A] 9-12; | [XA]JP2008255379 (KOBELCO & MAT COPPER TUBE INC) [X] 5-8 * , claims; paragraph [0056]; table 1, example no.7 (Family: none) *[A] 1-4, 9-12; | [XA]WO2009107586 (MITSUBISHI SHINDO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1, 4-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0067], [0077]; table 2, alloy no.37 & US 2011/0100676 A1 claims; paragraphs [0080], [0094]; table 2, no.37 & EP 2246448 A1 & KR 10-2010-0068484 A & CN 101932741 A * [A] 2-3, 10-12; | [XA]JP2015004126 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1, 4-9 * , claims; paragraph [0047]; table 1, invention example 9 & US 2016/0122849 A1 claims; paragraph [0102]; table 1, no.9 & WO 2014/189103 A1 & EP 3006582 A1 & CN 105229181 A & KR 10-2016-0013025 A * [A] 2-3, 10-12 |