EP3477346 - DISPLAY BODY, A DEVICE PROVIDED WITH A DISPLAY BODY AND CORRESPONDING MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | OPTICAL DEVICE, DISPLAY BODY, DEVICE PROVIDED WITH DISPLAY BODY, OPTICAL FILTER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL DEVICE | ||
[2022/52] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASHITA, Masashi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 02 /
HAKII, Hidemitsu c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2019/18] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17815529.7 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017JP23301 | Priority number, date | JP20160125704 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016125704 | JP20160125705 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016125705 | JP20160126071 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016126071 | JP20160126072 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016126072 | JP20160181036 | 15.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016181036 | JP20160181037 | 15.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016181037 | JP20170092883 | 09.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017092883 | JP20170122322 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122322 | JP20170122323 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017122323 | [2019/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017222064 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477346 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3477346 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, B32B3/30, B32B15/08, B42D25/328, B42D25/373, G02B5/20, G02B5/28, G09F19/12 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
G02B5/28 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/08 (KR,US);
B32B3/30 (KR,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/45 (US);
G02B5/18 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/1823 (US);
G02B5/1857 (US);
G02B5/20 (EP,US);
G02B5/285 (US);
G03H1/0011 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEKÖRPER, MIT DEM ANZEIGEKÖRPER AUSGESTATTETE VORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/52] | English: | DISPLAY BODY, A DEVICE PROVIDED WITH A DISPLAY BODY AND CORRESPONDING MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2022/52] | French: | CORPS D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF POURVU DU CORPS D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2022/52] |
Former [2019/18] | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGEKÖRPER, MIT DEM ANZEIGEKÖRPER AUSGESTATTETE VORRICHTUNG, OPTISCHER FILTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/18] | OPTICAL DEVICE, DISPLAY BODY, DEVICE PROVIDED WITH DISPLAY BODY, OPTICAL FILTER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/18] | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE, CORPS D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF POURVU DU CORPS D'AFFICHAGE, FILTRE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2019 | Translation filed | 07.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2024
21.02.2024
ADMISSIBLE De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 02
26.02.2024
27.02.2024
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2024/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2024
21.02.2024
ADMISSIBLE De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 13.03.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.07.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | IE | 23.06.2023 | LU | 23.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 24.07.2023 | GB | 24.08.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 24.05.2023 | |
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 24.07.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 24.05.2023 | |
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 24.07.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 24.05.2023 | |
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | CZ | 24.05.2023 | |
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | CZ | 24.05.2023 | |
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 24.05.2023 | |
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009145764 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 12,16 * abstract *; | [XAI]WO2012156049 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,10,13,14,20 * page 8, line 19 - page 14, line 16; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-9,12,16-19 [I] 11; | [XA]JP2013174683 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,9,10,12-15,20 * abstract * [A] 2-8,16-19; | [A]US2014253920 (SUGIMOTO MAMORU [JP]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0074] - [0086]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2787340 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0048] - [0072] *; | [XA]US2015070693 (SUGIMOTO MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10,14,15,20 * paragraphs [0085] - [0120]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 2-8,16-19; | [XA]WO2015147283 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,16,20 * abstract * [A] 2-15,17-19 | International search | [Y]JP2008275740 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 13-14, 17 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0025]; fig. 1, 6 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2009145764 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-7, 15-16, 18, 20 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0070]; fig. 3, 19 (Family: none) * [Y] 8-15, 17, 19; | [Y]WO2013080473 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 13, 17 * , paragraphs [0090] to [0094] & US 2014/0329336 A1 paragraphs [0117] to [0121] & EP 2787340 A1 & CN 103946691 A & KR 10-2014-0096066 A & RU 2014120749 A & TW 201331569 A *; | [A]WO2013099875 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* , paragraphs [0038] to [0051], [0141] to [0146]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2014/0326988 A1 & EP 2799915 A1 paragraphs [0074] to [0087], [0181] to [0186]; fig. 1 to 2 & CN 104024894 A & KR 10-2014-0097468 A & KR 10-2015-0141196 A & TW 201333544 A *; | [XY]JP2013174683 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-12, 16, 18-20 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0035], [0060]; fig. 1 to 3, 6 (Family: none) * [Y] 8-15, 17, 19; | [XY]JP2015055482 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-12, 14-16, 18-20 * , paragraphs [0001], [0049] to [0084], [0111] to [0123], [0159], [0181] to [0184]; fig. 1 to 4, 10 & US 2015/0070693 A1 paragraphs [0002], [0085] to [0120], [0149] to [0161], [0198], [0220] to [0223]; fig. 1 to 4, 10 & CN 104422683 A * [Y] 13, 17 | by applicant | JPS5124272B | JP2014098780 | Opposition | US2010307705 | WO2013039454 | WO2015028037 | US2015219807 | WO2015147283 | AU2015234717 | JP2008275740 | WO2012156049 | JP2013174683 | WO2014023415 | - Davy Gérard; Stephen K Gray , "Aluminium plasmonics", Journal of Physics D: Applied Physics, Institute of Physics Publishing, Bristol, GB, Bristol, GB, (20141215), vol. 48, no. 18, doi:10.1088/0022-3727/48/18/184001, ISSN 0022-3727, page 184001, XP020283513 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/48/18/184001 | - Sadao Adachi, "1.4 OPTICAL DISPERSION RELATIONS", The Handbook on Optical Constants of Metal, World Scientific, (20120101), pages 11 - 12, 61-62, 153-156, XP093165084 | - Werner Martienssen, "3.4.6 Vitreous Silica", Springer Handbook of Condensed Matter and Materials Data, DE , Springer , (20050101), pages 556 - 557, ISBN 978-3-540-44376-6, XP093165093 | - M. T. Gali, "6. Replication", Micro-Optics: Elements, systems and applications, London, Artech House , (19980101), pages 153 - 174, ISBN 978-0-89006-982-0, XP093165098 | - Rudolf L. Van Renesse, "10.3.3 Mechanical Replication of Embossed Holograms", Micro-Optics: Elements, systems and applications, London, Artech House , (19980101), pages 232 - 233, ISBN 978-0-89006-982-0, XP093165102 |