EP3475021 - SCRAP CUTTING APPARATUS WITH TRAVELING PROTECTIVE ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMS International Corporation 12 Monongahela Ave. Glassport, Pennsylvania 15045 / US | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUTZ, Timothy, G. 16986 Mennell Road Grafton, Ohio 44044 / US | 02 /
JUNG, Joseph, H. 4747 Manorlake Drive Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17816210.3 | 22.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017US38758 | Priority number, date | US201662354293P | 24.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662354293 P | US201762481220P | 04.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762481220 P | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017223317 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3475021 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K7/10, B23K37/00, B23K37/02, B08B15/02 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
B23K37/0229 (EP,US);
B08B15/02 (EP);
B23K7/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | SCHROTTSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG MIT BEWEGLICHEM SCHUTZGEHÄUSE | [2019/18] | English: | SCRAP CUTTING APPARATUS WITH TRAVELING PROTECTIVE ENCLOSURE | [2019/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE COUPE DE REBUTS DOTÉ D'UNE ENCEINTE DE PROTECTION MOBILE | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 17.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3614077 (BLACKBURN MARVIN J, et al) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 19 * * column 4, line 1 - line 51 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1,7,12,13,20; | [YA]EP0051250 (MANNESMANN DEMAG SACK [DE], et al) [Y] 11-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 37 * * page 5, line 19 - line 36 * * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 27 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1,20; | [YA]US4854551 (GRIEBELER ELMER L [US]) [Y] 15,16,18,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 24 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 18 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1-3,7,20; | [IA]DE2706014 (IPU LTD) [I] 1,2,7,10 * page 6, line 1 - line 4 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 6 * * page 13, line 1 - line 7 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 20; | [A]JPS58103962 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3,7,10-12,14-20 * abstract * * figure - * | [XYI] - Anonymous, "Innovative Cutting Technology", ICT, TMS INTERNATIONAL, (20160412), URL: http://www.tmsinternational.com/innovative-cutting-technology.cfm, (20190508), XP055586595 [X] 1-3,7-10,20 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6,11-16,18,19 [I] 17 | International search | [YA]US2008206038 (KEITH MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1 * ; figures 1-2, 6a; paragraphs [0029-0031, 0037] * [A] 4-6, 11-19; | [A]US6060679 (LUDWIGSON ROBERT G [US], et al) [A] 11-19 * ; figures 1-2; column 2, line 45 to column 3, line 41 * | [XYA] - "Innovative Cutting Technology (ICT", TMS Internationa l, (20160412), URL: http://www.tmsinternational.com/innovative-cutting-technology.cfm, (20170825), XP055586595 [X] 1-3, 7-10 [Y] 1 [A] 4-6, 11-19 |