EP3574233 - TRANSMISSION COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISS, Tim Grazerstrasse 28 30519 Hannover / DE | 02 /
FREIHEIT, Philipp Uferzeile 3 30627 Hannover / DE | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Kilsch, Armin Ralph Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 17816780.5 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017EP82728 | Priority number, date | DE201710201075 | 24.01.2017 Original published format: DE102017201075 | [2019/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018137844 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3574233 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/02, F16H57/035, F16H57/04 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
F16H7/02 (EP);
F16H57/035 (EP);
F16H57/0416 (EP);
F16H2007/0865 (EP);
F16H2007/0874 (EP);
F16H2007/0897 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEBAUTEIL | [2019/49] | English: | TRANSMISSION COMPONENT | [2019/49] | French: | COMPOSANT DE TRANSMISSION | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 26.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1906052 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,11 * figures 1,6 * [Y] 6; | [XY]DE102007052209 (RISTL HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * figures 1,4,7,8 * [Y] 6; | [X]DE102014213141 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,11 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2012152644 (KYDD PAUL HARRIMAN [US]) [X] 1-4,8,10,11 * figures 1,3a *; | [X]DE3631517 (SCHMIDT KONRAD DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,9-11 * figures 1,2,5 * | by applicant | DE102010060703 | DE102010060705 |