EP3562408 - RIGID AND FLEXIBLE LAPAROSCOPIC MULTIPLE COMPONENT MATERIAL DISPENSING DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo 00969 / PR | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIVEY, James T. 920 US Highway 202 S. Raritan, New Jersey 08869 / US | 02 /
TREZZA, II, Michael J. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | 03 /
GOODMAN, John 3228 Cottontail Court Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | 04 /
VENDELY, Michael J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 05 /
SETSER, Michael E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17817514.7 | 29.11.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017US63619 | Priority number, date | US201615392970 | 28.12.2016 Original published format: US201615392970 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018125480 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562408 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61M39/10 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61M39/10 (EP,US);
A61M25/0026 (US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (US);
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00495 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE VON STARREM UND FLEXIBLEM LAPAROSKOPISCHEN MEHRKOMPONENTENMATERIAL | [2019/45] | English: | RIGID AND FLEXIBLE LAPAROSCOPIC MULTIPLE COMPONENT MATERIAL DISPENSING DEVICES AND METHODS | [2019/45] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DISTRIBUTION DE MATÉRIAU À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES, LAPAROSCOPIQUES ET RIGIDES | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 26.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4932942 (MASLANKA HARALD [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,11-14,17,18 * columns 2,3; figures 1,2,4 * [I] 2,8-10,15,16,20; | [A]US4979942 (WOLF STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3 - column 4; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4223356 (OCTAPHARMA AG GLARUS [CH]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO0006216 (FOCAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO03039375 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 4,6,11 *; | [XI]US2008060970 (WHEELER JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13-15,18,20 * paragraph [0036]; figures 1-2,7-10 * [I] 6,7,16,17; | [A]WO2009132331 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0039] , [0051]; figures 7,11 *; | [A]US2014014213 (HULL LES [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,4 *; | [I]WO2014207920 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [I] 1,3,4,6-18,20 * figures 1-3 * |