EP3548581 - COMPOSITION FOR REMEDIATING IRON SULFIDE IN OILFIELD PRODUCTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ChampionX USA Inc. 11177 S. Stadium Dr. Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states Ecolab USA, Inc. 1 Ecolab Place St. Paul, Minnesota 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Brian Michael 423 Abbott Circle Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 02 /
SOLOMON, Kim R. 337 Devin Lane River Falls, Wisconsin 54022 / US | 03 /
SILVERNAIL, Carter 705 Chicago Drive Burnsville, Minnesota 55306 / US | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/36] |
Former [2019/41] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17817551.9 | 30.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017US63860 | Priority number, date | US201662428123P | 30.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662428123 P | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018102503 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548581 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3548581 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/524, C09K8/532, C09K8/54, C23F11/12, C23F11/14 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
C09K8/54 (EP,US);
C09K8/524 (EP,US);
C09K8/532 (EP,US);
C11D1/00 (US);
C23F11/04 (US);
C23F11/10 (EP,US);
C23F11/126 (US);
C23F11/149 (EP,US);
C23F11/161 (EP,US);
C23G1/061 (EP,US);
C23G1/065 (EP,US);
C23G1/088 (EP,US);
C09K2208/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SANIERUNG VON EISENSULFID IN ÖLFELDPRODUKTIONSSYSTEMEN | [2019/41] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR REMEDIATING IRON SULFIDE IN OILFIELD PRODUCTION SYSTEMS | [2019/41] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ÉLIMINER LE SULFURE DE FER DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE PRODUCTION DE CHAMP DE PÉTROLE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 30.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP23194956.1 / EP4296403 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | LU | 30.11.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
LU | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4276185 (MARTIN LARRY D) [Y] 1,8-18,21-23,25,26 * claims 15,27 *; | [A]US4633949 (CROWE CURTIS W [US]) [A] 1-34* claims 1,9 *; | [Y]US2009149356 (TIWARI LAXMIKANT [GB], et al) [Y] 1,8-18,21-23,25,26 * example 4; claims 1,4,8 *; | [X]CN105036365 (SUZHOU YOUJUN ENVIRONMENT SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-7,19,20,24,27-32 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004]; example 2; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2016105381 (MULTI CHEM GROUP LLC [US]) [X] 27,28,30,31,33,34 * page 5, lines 23-30; claims 1,2,5 * * page 3, lines 6-9 *; | [T] - Anonymous, "Natriumgluconat | 527-07-1", Chemicalbook, (20171231), URL: http://www.chemicalbook.com/ChemicalProductProperty_DE_CB9229989.htm, (20180123), XP055443331 [T] 1-34 * the whole document * | [A] - ROBERT TALBOT ET AL, "TetrakisHydroxymethylPhosphonium Sulfate (THPS) for Dissolving Iron Sulfides Downhole and Topsides - A Study of the Chemistry Influencing Dissolution", CORROSION, (20020407), pages 1 - 14, XP055443209 [A] 1-34 * page 2 * | [A] - JULIET YAP ET AL, "Removing Iron Sulfide Scale: A Novel Approach", ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL PETROLEUM EXHIBITION AND CONFERENCE, (20100101), doi:10.2118/138520-MS, XP055443526 [A] 1-34 * page 1 - page 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/138520-MS |