EP3580600 - ALL-REFLECTIVE SOLAR CORONAGRAPH SENSOR AND THERMAL CONTROL SUBSYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Lacy G. 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 02 /
QUEZADA, Jose B. 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Neil R. 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 17818403.2 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/51] | WO2017US64938 | Priority number, date | US201715426790 | 07.02.2017 Original published format: US201715426790 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018147926 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580600 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/06, G02B17/00, G02B17/06, G02B7/18, G02B5/00, G02B27/14 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
B64G1/105 (EP);
G02B17/023 (KR,US);
B64G1/1057 (EP,US);
B64G1/50 (EP);
B64G1/66 (EP);
G02B17/006 (KR,US);
G02B17/008 (EP,KR,US);
G02B17/0657 (EP,KR,US);
G02B23/02 (KR,US);
G02B23/06 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/1066 (KR,US);
G02B27/141 (KR,US);
G02B27/143 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/003 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/181 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | VOLLREFLEKTIERENDER SONNENKORONAGRAPHSENSOR UND THERMISCHES STEUERUNGSSUBSYSTEM | [2019/51] | English: | ALL-REFLECTIVE SOLAR CORONAGRAPH SENSOR AND THERMAL CONTROL SUBSYSTEM | [2019/51] | French: | CAPTEUR DE CORONAGRAPH À RÉFLEXION TOTALE ET SOUS-SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE THERMIQUE | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 04.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4923293 (NELLES BRUNO [DE], et al); | [I]US2004156087 (OPPENHEIMER BEN R [US], et al); | by applicant | US5078502 | US5331470 |