EP3479905 - STATE DETERMINATION DEVICE, METHOD, PROGRAM, STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states ABB K.K. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Masaru c/o ABB K.K. 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6022 / JP | 02 /
RIVELAND, Steinar Lalandsvein 174 Klepp Stasjon, Rogaland 4353 / NO | [2019/24] |
Former [2019/19] | 01 /
TERADA, Masaru c/o ABB K.K. 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6022 / JP | ||
02 /
RIVELAND, Steinar c/o ABB AS Nordlysvegen Bryne Rogaland 4340 / NO | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/34] |
Former [2019/19] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17819762.0 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017JP20498 | Priority number, date | JP20160129792 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016129792 | [2019/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018003396 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479905 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3479905 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/08, B05B3/10, B05B5/04, B05B12/08, B05B9/04, B05B12/00, // B05B5/043, B05B13/04, B05B12/14 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
B05B5/0415 (EP,US);
B05B12/004 (EP,US);
B05B12/08 (EP);
B05B3/1035 (US);
B05B9/0416 (EP);
G01M1/22 (EP);
B05B12/149 (EP);
B05B13/0452 (EP);
B05B3/1064 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | B05B5/08, B05B3/10, B05B5/04, B05B12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSTANDSBESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN, PROGRAMM, SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/19] | English: | STATE DETERMINATION DEVICE, METHOD, PROGRAM, STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉTAT, PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2019 | Translation filed | 22.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 15.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2017 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.06.2017 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.06.2017 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07311082 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1,2,7-11 * paragraph [0004]; figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]JPH09117696 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,2,7-11 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] *; | [XAI]JP2001198498 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,9-11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1, 12 * * paragraph [0048] * [A] 2,4-8 [I] 3; | [A]WO2005079996 (ABB KK [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005263611 (GOTOH YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0016] *; | [A] - MARTIN ANGELO, "Vibration Monitoring of Machines", TECHNICAL REVIEW,, (19870101), no. 1, pages 1 - 36, XP001420537 [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH09117696 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-11 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003001147 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [A] 1-11* , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010253434 (YUSHIN KOKI KK) [A] 1-11 * , (Family: none) * |