EP3483162 - N-ALKYLSULFONYL CONDENSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, INSECTICIDE CONTAINING THE COMPOUND, AND METHOD FOR USING THE INSECTICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/20] | N-ALKYLSULFONYL-FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, PESTICIDE CONTAINING SAID COMPOUND, AND METHOD FOR USING SAID PESTICIDE | ||
[2021/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Yutaka c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Chiaki c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 03 /
SAKURAI, Yuhji c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 04 /
FUJIHARA, Hirokazu c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 05 /
MATSUO, Soichiro c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 06 /
YONEMURA, Ikki c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 07 /
SUWA, Akiyuki c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 08 /
FUJIE, Shunpei c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 09 /
TANAKA, Ryosuke c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17820330.3 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017JP24158 | Priority number, date | JP20160131280 | 01.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016131280 | JP20160180927 | 15.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016180927 | [2019/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018003976 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483162 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3483162 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3483162 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D413/04, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D513/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/4184, A61K31/423, A61K31/437, A61K31/5025, A01N43/90, A61P33/00 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/423 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/5025 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | C07D487/04, A01N43/90, A01P7/04, A61K31/4184, A61K31/423, A61K31/437, A61K31/5025, A61P33/00, C07D403/04, C07D413/04, C07D471/04, C07D513/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-ALKYLSULFONYL-KONDENSIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG ODER SALZ DAVON, PESTIZID MIT BESAGTER VERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DES BESAGTEN PESTIZIDS | [2019/20] | English: | N-ALKYLSULFONYL CONDENSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, INSECTICIDE CONTAINING THE COMPOUND, AND METHOD FOR USING THE INSECTICIDE | [2021/47] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE N-ALKYLSULFONYLE FUSIONNÉ OU LEUR SELS, PESTICIDE CONTENANT LEDIT COMPOSÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DUDIT PESTICIDE | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/20] | N-ALKYLSULFONYL-FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, PESTICIDE CONTAINING SAID COMPOUND, AND METHOD FOR USING SAID PESTICIDE | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2019 | Translation filed | 14.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 30.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2017 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | GB | 30.06.2022 | IE | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | LU | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 30.06.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
GB | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.06.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
GB | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.06.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
GB | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
GB | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9518801 (RHONE POULENC AGRICULTURE [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008132434 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2013018928 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , & JP 2014-5263 A & US 2014/0194290 A1 & US 2015/0197532 A1 & US 2016/0009715 A1 & EP 2739624 A1 & AU 2012290923 A & CA 2844241 A & CN 103717598 A & KR 10-2014-0068920 A & MX 2014000556 A *; | [A]WO2015000715 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * , & JP 2016-528189 A & US 2016/0255837 A1 & EP 3016949 A1 & CA 2917262 A & CN 105431433 A & KR 10-2016-0029078 A & MX 2015017821 A & TW 201536781 A & AR 96783 A *; | [A]WO2016039444 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2016091731 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * , & AR 102964 A *; | [PA]WO2016129684 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-14* , (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2016142327 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [PA] 1-14 * , (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2016162318 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [PA] 1-4 * , & UY 36609 A & TW 201708216 A *; | [PA]WO2017061497 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-14 * , (Family: none) * |