EP3478901 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSERTING A TONGUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANSSON, Jonas Allerumsvägen 317 SE-254 76 Allerum / SE | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17820655.3 | 28.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017SE50716 | Priority number, date | SE20160050941 | 29.06.2016 Original published format: SE 1650941 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018004438 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3478901 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3478901 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, B27M3/04, B27M3/18, B65B61/08, E04F15/10 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
B27F1/12 (EP,EA,US);
B27G13/005 (EP,EA,US);
B27G13/08 (EP,EA,US);
E04F15/02038 (EP);
E04F15/102 (EP);
B27M3/0066 (EP);
E04F2201/0138 (EP);
E04F2201/023 (EP);
E04F2201/0547 (EP);
E04F2201/0588 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | E04F15/02, B27M3/04, B27M3/18, B65B61/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSETZEN EINER ZUNGE | [2019/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSERTING A TONGUE | [2019/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION D'UNE LANGUETTE | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 09.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2017 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | IE | 28.06.2021 | LU | 28.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1674223 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * figure - * [A] 14; | [XAI]WO2010001262 (SCHULTE GUIDO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,12 * abstract * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 14 * * figure - * [A] 5-7,9-11,14 [I] 3,13; | [XAI]US2014053497 (PERVAN DARKO [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0114]; figures 8,9 * [A] 5-7,9-11,14 [I] 3,13; | [XA]EP2774735 (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0032] , [0035] , [0036] , [0 37] * * figure - * [A] 14; | [XPA]US2016251859 (PERVAN DARKO [SE], et al) [XP] 1-4,8,12 * abstract * * figure 39 *[A] 5-7,9-11,13,14 | International search | [A]US2009193748 (BOO CHRISTIAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; abstract; paragraph [0170]; figures 22a-f *; | [A]WO2009124517 (WAECHTER PACKAUTOMATIK GMBH & [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* ; abstract; figure 2; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2014053497 (PERVAN DARKO [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0112], [0113]; figures 10a-e; Details 58,65 * |