EP3720554 - PATIENT POSITIONING USING A SKELETON MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEIGEL, Jochen c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE | 02 /
IVANOVSKA, Ivana c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE | 03 /
KAISER, Hagen c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE | 04 /
APONTE, Pablo c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 17821509.1 | 07.12.2017 | [2020/42] | WO2017EP81839 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110105 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720554 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3720554 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, // A61B90/00, A61B34/10 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61N5/1048 (EP);
G06T15/10 (US);
G09B19/003 (US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2090/365 (EP);
A61B2090/366 (EP);
A61N2005/1059 (EP);
A61N2005/1074 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | A61N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENPOSITIONIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES SKELETTMODELLS | [2020/42] | English: | PATIENT POSITIONING USING A SKELETON MODEL | [2020/42] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT DE PATIENT À L'AIDE D'UN MODÈLE DE SQUELETTE | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 08.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2017 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | IE | 07.12.2021 | LU | 07.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.12.2017 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0024333 (VARIAN MED SYS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 2 - line 20 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 21 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 9 * * page 13, line 9 - line 17 * * figure 3e *; | [A]WO2014024115 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 9 - line 29 * * page 5, line 24 - page 9, line 5 ** figures 1,2 * | by applicant | - M. POLLEFEYS et al., Metric 3D Surface Reconstruction from Uncalibrated Image Sequences, Springer-Verlag, (19980000), pages 139 - 154 | - J. SHOTTON et al., "Real-time human pose recognition in parts from single depth images", IEEE Conference on Computer Vision and Pattern Recognition (CVPR, (20110000), doi:doi:10.1109/CVPR.2011.5995316, pages 1297 - 1304, XP032037818 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2011.5995316 | - P.J. BESL et al., "A Method for Registration of 3-D Shapes", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (19920000), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/34.121791, pages 239 - 256, XP000248481 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.121791 | - P. BIBER et al., "The Normal Distributions Transform: A New Approach to Laser Scan Matching", IEEE International Conference on Intelligent Robots and Systems, (20030000), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/IROS.2003.1249285, pages 2743 - 2748, XP010675504 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2003.1249285 |