EP3548060 - PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF FETAL ALCOHOL SYNDROME DISORDERS (FASD) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universite de Rouen Normandie 1, rue Thomas Beckett 76821 Mont Saint Aignan Cedex / FR | For all designated states Centre Hospitalier Universitaire de Rouen 1, rue de Germont 76000 Rouen / FR | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ, Bruno José 25 le clos des Tilleuls 76150 La Vaupalière / FR | 02 /
MARRET, Stéphane 121 rue de Bihorel 76000 Rouen / FR | 03 /
LECUYER, Matthieu Jean Alexandre 88 Boulevard d'Orléans Appt. 0606 76000 Rouen / FR | 04 /
LAQUERRIERE, Annie 14 rue de la vieille côte du calvaire 76240 Bonsecours / FR | 05 /
BEKRI, Soumeya 13 ter rue du Cantony 76160 St Leger du Bourg Denis / FR | 06 /
LESUEUR, Céline 15 parc du Cailly 76130 Mont Saint Aignan / FR | 07 /
JEGOU, Sylvie Marguerite Alberte 4 Impasse Tabouret 76000 Rouen / FR | 08 /
MARCORELLES, Pascale Yvonne Joséphine 24 rampe du merle blanc 29200 Brest / FR | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17821808.7 | 01.12.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP81159 | Priority number, date | FR20160061813 | 01.12.2016 Original published format: FR 1661813 | [2019/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018100143 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548060 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, G01N33/68, A61P43/00, C12Q1/68, A61P25/32, C12Q1/6883 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A61K38/1866 (EP,US);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61P25/00 (KR);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P43/00 (KR);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/6872 (KR);
C12Q2600/112 (US);
C12Q2600/118 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | PLAZENTALER WACHSTUMSFAKTOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FETALEM ALKOHOLSYNDROM (FAS) | [2019/41] | English: | PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF FETAL ALCOHOL SYNDROME DISORDERS (FASD) | [2019/41] | French: | FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE PLACENTAIRE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES CAUSES PAR L'ALCOOLISATION FOETALE (TCAF) | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 01.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/19] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6933277 (BRENNEMAN DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004029325 (UNIV LEIPZIG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - KESHAV K. GUPTA ET AL, "An Update on Fetal Alcohol Syndrome-Pathogenesis, Risks, and Treatment", ALCOHOLISM: CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RESEARCH., US, (20160704), vol. 40, no. 8, doi:10.1111/acer.13135, ISSN 0145-6008, pages 1594 - 1602, XP055404686 [A] 1-15 * page 1597 - page 1599 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/acer.13135 | [A] - ROSENBERG M J ET AL, "Effects of moderate drinking during pregnancy on placental gene expression", ALCOHOL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 44, no. 7-8, ISSN 0741-8329, (20101101), pages 673 - 690, (20100106), XP027527154 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PIIA VUORELA ET AL, "Hepatocyte Growth Factor, Epidermal Growth Factor, and Placenta Growth Factor Concentrations in Peripheral Blood of Pregnant Women With Alcohol Abuse", ALCOHOLISM: CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RESEARCH., US, (20020501), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1530-0277.2002.tb02591.x, ISSN 0145-6008, pages 682 - 687, XP055261678 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1530-0277.2002.tb02591.x | [AD] - SYLVIE JÉGOU ET AL, "Prenatal Alcohol Exposure Affects Vasculature Development in the Neonatal Brain", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY., BOSTON, US, (20121231), vol. 72, no. 6, doi:10.1002/ana.23699, ISSN 0364-5134, pages 952 - 960, XP055261686 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.23699 | by applicant | US4849077 | US4882127 | WO0012508 | WO03066896 | US6723513 | EP1141399 | WO2005085260 | WO2006084132 | US2006275782 | WO2007111924 | US2008020392 | US7556922 | US2009181860 | US2009181385 | US2009186349 | US2015013359 | - LU et al., Discov Med, (20160000), vol. 21, pages 349 - 361 | - APRILE et al., Crit Rev Oncol Hematol, (20150000), vol. 95, pages 165 - 178 | - SHIBUYA, Endocr Metab Immune Disord Drug Targets, (20150000), vol. 15, pages 135 - 144 | - HARD et al., Fondation Act Paediatrica, (20110000), vol. 100, pages 1063 - 1065 | - Uniprot, Database accession no. P49763-2 | - Recombinant DNA Technology I, Academy of Sciences, (19910000), vol. 646 | - Recombinant DNA Technology 1, Academy of Sciences, (19910000), vol. 646 | - ADRA et al., Gene, (19870000), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 65 - 74 | - MOESSLER et al., Development, (19960800), vol. 122, no. 8, pages 2415 - 2425 | - CIERNIK I. F. et al., The Journal of Immunology, (19990000), vol. 162, pages 3915 - 3925 | - BUCKHOLZ RG, Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (19930000), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 538 - 542 | - OLINS; LEE, Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (19930000), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 520 - 525 | - EDWARDS CP; ARUFFO A, Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (19930000), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 558 - 563 | - LUCKOW VA, Journal of Virology, (19930000), vol. 67, no. 8, pages 4566 - 4579 | - ZHENG et al., Acta Ophthalmologica, (20120000), vol. 90, no. 7, pages e512 - e523 | - DEFALCO, Exp Mol Med., (20120000), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 1 - 9 | - SHENDURE; JI, Nat Biotechnol., (20080000), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 1135 - 1145 | - PIHLAK et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20080000), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 676 - 684 | - FULLER et al., Nature Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 1013 - 1023 | - MARDIS, Genome Med., (20090000), vol. 1, no. 4, page 40 | - METZKER, Nature Rev. Genet., (20100000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 31 - 46 |