EP3562468 - MICRO- OR NANOPARTICULAR MULTILAMELLAR VESICLES, COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR THEIR USE IN SKIN CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma Holding SA Rue d'Entre-deux-Villes, 10 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | [2021/10] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Nestlé Skin Health SA Avenue Gratta-Paille 2 1018 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLARD, Claire 1122 Chemin du Château Domaine de la Jouvencelle 06250 Mougins / FR | 02 /
RIVAL, Yves 594 chemin des Combes, Chemin Magnique, Jardin d'Isis 06600 Antibes / FR | 03 /
ANTHONIOZ, Lise 620 Avenue Saint Philippe Les terrasses du golf, App. 141 06410 Biot / FR | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17821958.0 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017EP84759 | Priority number, date | EP20160306845 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16306845 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018122342 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562468 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/73, A61K8/14, A61Q19/08 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61K8/14 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP);
A61K8/735 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | MIKRO- ODER NANOPARTIKULÄRE MULTILAMELLARE VESIKEL, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER HAUTPFLEGE | [2019/45] | English: | MICRO- OR NANOPARTICULAR MULTILAMELLAR VESICLES, COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR THEIR USE IN SKIN CARE | [2019/45] | French: | VÉSICULES MULTILAMELLAIRES MICRO- OU NANOPARTICULAIRES, COMPOSITIONS LES COMPRENANT ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DANS LES SOINS DE LA PEAU | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 22.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 08.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5830499 (BOUWSTRA JOHANNA AALTJE [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,3; claims 1,8,9; table 1 *; | [Y]FR2771635 (CAPSULIS [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * example 2; claims 1-14 *; | [XY]FR2939317 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,5-15 * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 1; claims 1-13 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 16 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2014206500 (GALDERMA SA [CH]) [Y] 1-15* tables 1,3-6 *; | [Y]US2015272851 (BOURDON FRANÇOIS [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * table 2 *; | [Y] - Bengt Ågerup ET AL, "NASHA(TM) - the MONOGRAPH 1 NASHA (TM) - the MONOGRAPH", (20080101), URL: http://www.restylane.com/Global/Monograph of NASHA.pdf, (20160713), XP055288338 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9319735 | WO9518601 | WO9700623 | WO9704012 | US5792472 | - ESSENDOUBI M et al., Skin Res Technol, (20150000), vol. 0, pages 1 - 8 | - KEENE et al., Carbohydrate Polymers, (20130000), vol. 91, pages 410 - 418 |