EP3558093 - PATIENT MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHLERT, Joachim High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KUENEN, Maarten, Petrus, Joseph High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CIUHU, Calina High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HUIJBREGTS, Laurentia, Johanna High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
AARTS, Ronaldus, Maria High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
BEZEMER, Rick P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Kabuk, Yavuz Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17822271.7 | 20.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017EP83740 | Priority number, date | EP20160205200 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16205200 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018115082 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558093 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/024 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/682 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (US);
A61B5/01 (US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/02416 (EP);
A61B5/1116 (US);
A61B5/1118 (US);
A61B5/113 (US);
A61B5/4812 (US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B7/003 (US);
A61B5/02154 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | PATIENTENÜBERWACHUNG | [2019/44] | English: | PATIENT MONITORING | [2019/44] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE PATIENT | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 22.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.01.2025 | 30.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.10.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/45] | 28.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE4130522 (PEISSNER ANNE LY DR MED VET [DE]); | [YA]US2010152599 (DUHAMEL JAMES BRIAN [US], et al); | by applicant | DE4130522 | US2010152599 |