EP3732841 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND ENTITY FOR A MEDIA TRANSFER SESSION IN AN IMS INFRASTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/43] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLDUS, Rogier August Caspar Joseph Frankische Driehoek 29 5052 BM Goirle / NL | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/43] |
Former [2020/45] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17822350.9 | 29.12.2017 | [2020/45] | WO2017EP84818 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019129359 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732841 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3732841 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L12/00 (RU);
H04L65/1026 (EP,US);
H04L65/1036 (EP,US);
H04W80/10 (RU);
H04W88/16 (RU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND ENTITÄT FÜR EINE MEDIENTRANSFERSITZUNG IN EINER IMS-INFRASTRUKTUR | [2020/45] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND ENTITY FOR A MEDIA TRANSFER SESSION IN AN IMS INFRASTRUCTURE | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET ENTITÉ POUR UNE SESSION DE TRANSFERT MULTIMÉDIA DANS UNE INFRASTRUCTURE IMS | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 27.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2017 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | IE | 29.12.2021 | LU | 29.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.12.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 29.12.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014139563 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-16 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 8 * * page 13, line 18 - page 17, line 6 ** page 20, line 20 - page 22, line 10; figure 12; claim 1 *; | [A]US9432414 (BELLING THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 3 * * figures 1a, 1b; claim 1 * |