EP3551848 - SNUBBER TOOL FOR DOWNHOLE TOOL STRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lord Corporation 111 Lord Drive Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Michael R. 5398 Old Meadville Road Union City, Pennsylvania 16438 / US | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/42] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17822946.4 | 12.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017US65798 | Priority number, date | US201662432743P | 12.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662432743 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018111863 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3551848 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551848 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/01, E21B47/024, E21B17/07 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
E21B47/024 (EP,US);
E21B47/01 (EP,US);
E21B17/07 (EP,US);
E21B47/017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFVORRICHTUNG FÜR BOHRLOCHWERKZEUGSTRANG | [2020/23] | English: | SNUBBER TOOL FOR DOWNHOLE TOOL STRING | [2019/42] | French: | AMORTISSEUR POUR TRAIN D'OUTIL DE FOND DE PUITS | [2020/23] |
Former [2019/42] | ANSCHLAGPUFFER FÜR BOHRLOCHWERKZEUGSTRANG | ||
Former [2019/42] | OUTIL D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR TRAIN D'OUTILS DE FOND DE TROU | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2017 | AL | 28.10.2020 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | IT | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | IE | 12.12.2020 | LU | 12.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.12.2017 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MT | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011186284 (JEKIELEK DAVID [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2015112821 (LORD CORP [US]) [AD] 1-20* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015112821 |