EP3551332 - INTEGRATED PURIFICATION AND MEASUREMENT OF DNA METHYLATION AND CO-MEASUREMENT OF MUTATIONS AND/OR MRNA EXPRESSION LEVELS IN AN AUTOMATED REACTION CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cepheid 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAI, Edwin Wei-Lung 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
KOHLWAY, Andrew 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
VAN ATTA, Reuel 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 04 /
HIGUCHI, Russell 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 05 /
GALL, Alexander A. 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 06 /
KOCMOND, Kriszten 904 Caribbean Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | [2024/02] |
Former [2019/42] | Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 17822953.0 | 12.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017US65905 | Priority number, date | US201662433165P | 12.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662433165 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018111935 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3551332 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551332 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01L7/00, C12Q1/6827, C12N15/10, G01N35/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/502 (EP,KR,US);
G01N35/00 (KR);
B01L7/52 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/1006 (KR,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6853 (KR,US);
C12Q1/686 (KR,US);
B01L2200/0652 (KR);
B01L2200/0663 (KR);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (US);
B01L2300/0861 (KR,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/1805 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2400/0644 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
C12Q2523/125 (KR);
C12Q2531/113 (KR);
C12Q2535/122 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2523/125, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2535/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE REINIGUNG UND MESSUNG DER DNA-METHYLIERUNG UND KO-MESSUNG VON MUTATIONEN UND/ODER MRNA-EXPRESSIONSNIVEAUS IN EINER AUTOMATISIERTEN REAKTIONSKARTUSCHE | [2019/42] | English: | INTEGRATED PURIFICATION AND MEASUREMENT OF DNA METHYLATION AND CO-MEASUREMENT OF MUTATIONS AND/OR MRNA EXPRESSION LEVELS IN AN AUTOMATED REACTION CARTRIDGE | [2019/42] | French: | PURIFICATION ET MESURE DE LA MÉTHYLATION DE L'ADN INTÉGRÉES ET CO-MESURE DES MUTATIONS ET/OU DES NIVEAUX D'EXPRESSION DE L'ARNM DANS UNE CARTOUCHE DE RÉACTION AUTOMATISÉE | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015119268 (BISHOP JOHN L [US]) [Y] 1-31 * paragraphs [0047] , [0055] , [0081] - [0083] * * figures 1-3 * * abstract * * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2016205233 (CEPHEID [US]) [XP] 1-31 * figures 1-39 * * claims 1-128 * * abstract ** the whole document *; | [Y] - Ben Butkus, "Hopkins Lab, Cepheid Developing Methylated DNA Panel for Breast Cancer Dx, Monitoring | GenomeWeb", (20151106), URL: https://www.genomeweb.com/molecular-diagnostics/hopkins-lab-cepheid-developing-methylated-dna-panel-breast-cancer-dx#.Wq97n2fderg, (20180319), XP055460431 [Y] 1-31 * page 2, paragraphs 1-3 * * abstract * * the whole document * | Examination | - Emily Eva Holmes ET AL, "Performance Evaluation of Kits for Bisulfite-Conversion of DNA from Tissues, Cell Lines, FFPE Tissues, Aspirates, Lavages, Effusions, Plasma, Serum, and Urine", PLoS ONE, (20140403), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0093933, page e93933, XP055224494 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0093933 | by applicant | EP0070685 | US5210015 | US5538848 | WO9731256 | US5686243 | WO9803673 | US5830711 | US5958349 | US6027998 | US6027889 | WO0056927 | US6150097 | WO0192579 | US6403037 | US6440725 | US6605451 | US6783736 | US6818185 | US2006068399 | WO2014052551 | - KLIMASAUSKAS et al., Cell, (19940000), vol. 76, pages 357 - 369 | - BIRD, Cell, (19920000), vol. 70, pages 5 - 8 | - LAIRD; JAENISCH, Human Mol. Genet., (19940000), vol. 3, pages 1487 - 1495 | - LI et al., Cell, (19920000), vol. 69, pages 915 - 926 | - MSUIH et al., J. Clin. Micro., (19960000), vol. 34, pages 501 - 507 | - ABRAMSON et al., Curr Opin Biotechnol., (19930200), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 41 - 47 | - DAY et al., Genomics, (19950000), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 152 - 162 | - EHRLICH et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 252, pages 1643 - 1650 | - FAVIS et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20000000), vol. 18, pages 561 - 564 | - RABENAU et al., Infection, (20000000), vol. 28, pages 97 - 102 | - BARANY, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19910000), vol. 88, pages 188 - 193 | - BI; SAMBROOK, Nucl. Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 2924 - 2951 | - ZIRVI et al., Nucl. Acid Res., (19990000), vol. 27, pages e40i - viii | - DEAN et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 5261 - 5266 | - BARANY; GELFAND, Gene, (19910000), vol. 109, pages 1 - 11 | - WALKER et al., Nucl. Acid Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 1691 - 1696 | - POLSTRA et al., BMC Inf. Dis., (20020000), vol. 2, page 18 | - LAGE et al., Genome Res., (20030200), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 294 - 307 | - LANDEGREN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 1080 | - DEMIDOV, V., Expert Rev Mol Diagn., (20021100), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 542 - 548 | - COOK et al., J Microbiol Methods, (20030500), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 165 - 174 | - SCHWEITZER et al., Curr Opin Biotechnol., (20010200), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 21 - 27 | - "Overview of principles of hybridization and the strategy of nucleic acid probe assays", Molecular Biology-Hybridization with Nucleic Acid Probes, Elsevier | - SAMBROOK; RUSSELL, Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory, Cold Spring Harbor Press, (20010000), vol. 1-3 | - SUBRAMANIAM et al., Front Oncol., (20140000), vol. 4 | - EADES et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20000000), vol. 28, no. 8, page E32 | - RAND et al., Methods, (20020000), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 114 - 120 | - EADS et al., Cancer Res., (19990000), vol. 59, pages 2302 - 2306 | - LIVAK et al., PCR Meth. Appl., (19950000), vol. 4, pages 357 - 362 | - LEE et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 3761 - 3766 | - FINK et al., Nat. Med., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 1329 - 1333 | - HERMAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19960000), vol. 93, pages 9821 - 9826 | - WAMECKE et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 4422 - 1426 | - FROMMER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 89, no. 5, pages 1827 - 1831 | - WOJDACZ; DOBROVIC, Nucleic Acids Res., (20070000), vol. 35, no. 6, page e41 | - COLELLA et al., BioTechniques, (20030000), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 146 - 150 | - TOST et al., BioTechniques, (20030000), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 152 - 156 | - WONG et al., BioTechniques, (20060000), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 734 - 739 | - EHRICH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20050000), vol. 102, no. 44, pages 15785 - 15790 | - BIANCO et al., Hum. Mutat., (19990000), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 289 - 293 | - ZHANG et al., Epigenetics, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 293 - 299 | - LUND et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, no. 28, pages 29147 - 29154 | - SANDOVAL et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20130000), pages 4140 - 4147 | - YANG et al., Cancer Cell, (20140000), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 577 - 590 | - PATSALIS et al., Exp. Opin. Biol. Ther., (20120000), vol. 12, no. 1, pages S155 - S161 | - STRYER, Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19780000), vol. 47, pages 819 - 846 | - SELVIN, Meth. Enzymol., (19950000), vol. 246, pages 300 - 335 | - CARDULLO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 8790 - 8794 | - MARRAS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, page e122 | - JOHANSSON et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20020000), vol. 124, pages 6950 - 6956 |