EP3558311 - PIMAVANSERIN ALONE OR IN COMBINATION FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE PSYCHOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc. 12830 El Camino Real, Suite 400 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2020/41] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc. 3611 Valley Centre Drive, Suite 300 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COATE, Bruce Duane 4855 E. Alder Drive San Diego, CA 92116 / US | 02 /
OWEN, James Randall 72 Knoll Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
KNOWLES, Mark Donald 11028 Cloverhurst Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
STANKOVIC, Srdjan, R. 15 Alexander Drive Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 05 /
YOUAKIM, James M . 246 Curwen Road Bryn Mawr, PA 19010 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17822999.3 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US66340 | Priority number, date | US201662436959P | 20.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662436959 P | US201762511223P | 25.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762511223 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018118626 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558311 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4468, A61P25/00, A61P25/16, A61P25/18, A61P25/28, A61K31/135, A61K31/343, A61K45/06 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (US);
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/27 (US);
A61K31/343 (EP);
A61K31/445 (US);
A61K31/473 (US);
A61K31/549 (US);
A61K31/55 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4468, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | PIMAVANSERIN ALLEIN ODER IN KOMBINATION ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS-ALZHEIMER-PSYCHOSE | [2019/44] | English: | PIMAVANSERIN ALONE OR IN COMBINATION FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE PSYCHOSIS | [2019/44] | French: | PIMAVANSÉRINE SEULE OU EN ASSOCIATION POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA PSYCHOSE LIÉE À LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 19.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014018348 (JAVITT DANIEL C [US]) [I] 1-37 * claims 1, 4, 5, 6 *; | [XI]WO2014085362 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9,11-13,18-25 * claims 1, 2 * * paragraph [00101] * * page 25; example 7 * [I] 3-6,10,13-17,26-37; | [I]WO2016201373 (AXOVANT SCIENCES LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-37 * claims 1, 2, 18, 28 *; | [I] - HATOUM H T ET AL, "The Use of the Occupational Disruptiveness Scale of the Neuropsychiatric Inventory-Nursing Home Version to Measure the Impact of Rivastigmine on the Disruptive Behavior of Nursing Home Residents With Alzheimer's Disease", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL DIRECTORS ASSOCIATION, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 6, no. 4, ISSN 1525-8610, (20050701), pages 238 - 245, (20050701), XP027854153 [I] 1-37 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004064738 | US2004213816 | US2006106063 | US2006111399 | US2007260064 | US2007264330 | WO2008144326 | US2009053329 | US7601740 | US7659285 | US7713995 | US7732462 | US7732615 | US7790899 | US7795547 | US2010305329 | US7868176 | US7994193 | US8008323 | WO2017015272 | - CUMMINGS, N. Eng. J. Med., (20040000), vol. 351, pages 56 - 67 | - HERRMANN; LANCTOT, Can. J. Psychiatry, (20070000), vol. 52, no. 10, pages 630 - 646 | - BALLARD et al., Nat. Rev. Neurol, (20090500), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 245 - 255 | - WOOD et al., Am. J. Geriatr. Psychiatr., (20000000), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 75 - 83 | - SCHNEIDER et al., Alzheimer's Disease and Associated Disorders, (19970000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages S22 - S32 | - WERNER et al., Geriatric Nursing, (19940000), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 142 - 146 | - KOSS et al., Alzheimer's Disease and Associated Disorders, (19970000), vol. 11, pages 45 - 50 | - COHEN-MANSFIELD et al., J of Gerontology Med. Sci., (19890000), vol. 44, no. 3, pages M77 - M84 | - GALASKO et al., Alzheimer's Disease and Associated Disorders, (19970000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages S33 - S39 | - FOLSTEIN et al., Journal of Psychiatric Research., (19750000), vol. 1 2, no. 3, pages 189 - 198 | - BUSNER; TARGUM, Psychiatry, (20070000), vol. 4, no. 7, pages 28 - 37 | - MCKHANN, Neuro., (19840000), vol. 34, pages 939 - 944 | - BALLARD et al., Nat. Rev. Neurol., (20090000), vol. May 5, no. 5, pages 245 - 255 | WO2016US42933 |