EP3481970 - THERMOCHEMICAL PROCESSING OF EXOTHERMIC METALLIC SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinaltek Pty. Ltd. 11 Moore Street Bexley, New South Wales 2207 / AU | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAIDAR, Jawad c/- KINALTEK PTY. LTD. 11 Moore Street Bexley, New South Wales 2207 / AU | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2021/52] |
Former [2019/20] | Peguet, Wilfried, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 17823347.4 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017AU50701 | Priority number, date | AU20160902659 | 06.07.2016 Original published format: AU 2016902659 | AU20170900864 | 13.03.2017 Original published format: AU 2017900864 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018006133 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481970 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3481970 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22B5/04, B22F9/20, C22B5/18, C22B34/20, C22B34/22, C22B34/24, C22B34/30, C22B34/32, C22B34/34, C22B34/36 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B22F9/20 (EP,KR,US);
C22B5/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22B34/20 (EP);
C22B34/22 (EP);
C22B34/24 (EP);
C22B34/30 (EP);
C22B34/32 (EP);
C22B34/34 (EP);
C22B34/36 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | C22B5/04, B22F9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOCHEMISCHE VERARBEITUNG VON EXOTHERMEN METALLISCHEN SYSTEMEN | [2019/20] | English: | THERMOCHEMICAL PROCESSING OF EXOTHERMIC METALLIC SYSTEMS | [2019/20] | French: | TRAITEMENT THERMOCHIMIQUE DE SYSTÈMES MÉTALLIQUES EXOTHERMIQUES | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 28.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2017 | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | TR | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | IE | 06.07.2022 | LU | 06.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]SU1759561 (METALL Z SIBELEKTROSTAL [SU]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-12 * the whole document * * abstract * [A] 3,14,15 [I] 7,8,13; | [A]US2004050208 (NIE JASON X [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-21 ** paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0096] *; | [XI]WO2007109847 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 22 * * page 21, line 23 - page 22, line 26 * * page 25, line 18 - line 25 * * page 31, line 1 - line 35 * * claims 1-18 * * figure 1 * [I] 13; | [XI] - DING J ET AL, "STRUCTURE AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF ULTRAFINE FE POWDERS BY MECHANOCHEMICAL PROCESSING", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960915), vol. 162, no. 2/03, doi:10.1016/S0304-8853(96)00265-X, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 271 - 276, XP000632468 [X] 1-6,9-14 * Section 3.3; page 274 - page 275 * * figure 6 * [I] 7,8,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(96)00265-X | International search | [X]US3252823 (JACOBSON HOWARD W, et al) [X] 18 * Claim 1 *; | [X]US3288596 (HOYT ERNEST B, et al) [X] 18 * Column 1, lines 32-43, figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5743955 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1-18 * & Espacenet used for English translation Whole Document *; | [A]US4877445 (OKUDAIRA SHIGENORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* Whole Document *; | [X]SU1759561 (METALL Z SIBELEKTROSTAL [SU]) [X] 1-2, 7-9, 11-12, 18 * & Espacenet used for English translation Columns 2-3, claim 1, table 1 * |