EP3483142 - AROMATIC ACETYLENE OR AROMATIC ETHYLENE COMPOUND, INTERMEDIATE, PREPARATION METHOD, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou Maxinovel Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. Building G5-616 Southern China New Material Innovation Park Building Two 31 Kefeng Road, Guangzhou Hitech Park, Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yuguang Building G5-616, Southern China New Material Innovation Park Building Two, 31 Kefeng Road Guangzhou Hitech Park Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 02 /
XU, Zusheng Building G5-616, Southern China New Material Innovation Park Building Two, 31 Kefeng Road Guangzhou Hitech Park Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 03 /
WU, Tianzhi Building G5-616, Southern China New Material Innovation Park Building Two, 31 Kefeng Road Guangzhou Hitech Park Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 04 /
HE, Min Building G5-616, Southern China New Material Innovation Park Building Two, 31 Kefeng Road Guangzhou Hitech Park Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Nong Building G5-616, Southern China New Material Innovation Park Building Two, 31 Kefeng Road Guangzhou Hitech Park Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17823607.1 | 04.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017CN91643 | Priority number, date | CN201610523836 | 05.07.2016 Original published format: CN201610523836 | [2019/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018006795 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483142 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/08, A61P35/00, C07D211/60, C07D319/18, C07D231/12, C07D405/04, C07D405/10, C07C215/00, C07D213/38, C07D213/48, A61K31/4025 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (KR);
A61K31/357 (KR);
A61K31/40 (KR);
A61K31/4025 (KR);
A61K31/44 (KR);
C07C215/10 (EP,US);
C07C217/58 (EP,US);
C07C22/04 (EP,US);
C07C22/08 (EP,US);
C07C229/22 (EP,US);
C07C229/24 (EP,US);
C07C229/64 (EP,US);
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C235/84 (EP,US);
C07C237/30 (EP,US);
C07C25/13 (KR);
C07C25/24 (EP,US);
C07C255/56 (EP,US);
C07C43/225 (EP,KR,US);
C07C47/548 (EP,KR,US);
C07C47/55 (EP,US);
C07C47/575 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/94 (EP,US);
C07D207/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/42 (KR);
C07D211/60 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/36 (KR);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D213/48 (EP,US);
C07D213/64 (KR);
C07D231/10 (US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D319/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHES ACETYLEN ODER AROMATISCHE ETHYLENVERBINDUNG, ZWISCHENPRODUKT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/20] | English: | AROMATIC ACETYLENE OR AROMATIC ETHYLENE COMPOUND, INTERMEDIATE, PREPARATION METHOD, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2019/20] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'ACÉTYLÈNE AROMATIQUE OU D'ÉTHYLÈNE AROMATIQUE, PRODUIT INTERMÉDIAIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | Translation filed | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 25.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9804528 (BAYER AG [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,15 * example 225; claims 1, 7 *; | [X]WO0153268 (AGOURON PHARMA [US]) [X] 1,3-8,13-15 * examples 53, 58, 61, 65, 68, 69, 71; claims 1, 6, 7 *; | [X]WO0162233 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-9,15 * claims 1, 2; compounds 130, 131, 149, 151 *; | [X]WO2004014865 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,15 * claims 1, 7, 8, 10 *; | [X]WO2011045344 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,13-15 * claims 1, 8-10; compound 273 *; | [IA]WO2015034820 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [I] 1-9,11-15 * claims 1, 10-12 * [A] 10; | [X]EP2952503 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 161; compound 95 *; | [IP]WO2017066227 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [IP] 1,3-9,11,13-15* page 747 - page 752; example 4517; claims 1, 17, 21 *; | [X] - BLY R K ET AL, "Heterocyclic studies. XIII. The aldol condensation of 2,3-dihydro-5-methyL-6-phenyl-4H-1,2diazepin-4-one and rearrangement to a pyridazine", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY,, (19640101), vol. 29, no. 8, doi:10.1021/JO01031A005, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2128 - 2135, XP002257943 [X] 1,3-9 * compound 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01031a005 | [X] - IMRAN MALIK ET AL, "Synthesis and Photophysical Properties of Alkynylated Pyrimidines by Site-Selective Sonogashira Reactions of 2,4,5,6-Tetrachloropyrimidine; First Synthesis of Tetraalkynyl-pyrimidines", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, DE, (20110401), vol. 2011, no. 11, doi:10.1002/ejoc.201001622, ISSN 1434-193X, pages 2088 - 2093, XP055571823 [X] 1-7 * compound 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.201001622 | [X] - PHI-HUNG NGUYEN ET AL, "Insulin-Mimetic Selaginellins from Selaginella tamariscina with Protein Tyrosine Phosphatase 1B (PTP1B) Inhibitory Activity", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (20150123), vol. 78, no. 1, doi:10.1021/np5005856, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 34 - 42, XP055169698 [X] 1-7 * compounds 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np5005856 | International search | [A]CN105705489 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO) [A] 1-19* description, paragraphs [0011]-[0584] *; | [X] - LIU JIA-KUO et al., "Design and synthesis of 3, - (prop-2-yn-l-yloxy) -biphenyl substituted cyclic acylguanidine compounds as BACE1 inhibitors", Chinese Chemical Letters, (20160302), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 961 - 963, XP029584546 [X] 1-8, 11 * , see pp. 962 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cclet.2016.02.006 | [X] - LIU JIA-KUO et al., "Design and synthesis of cyclic acylguanidines as BACE1 inhibitors", Chinese Chemical Letters, (20150723), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 1327 - 1330, XP029294987 [X] 1-8, 11 * , see pp. 1329 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cclet.2015.07.020 | [X] - REGISTRY, (20160427), Database accession no. 1899005-22-1, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20150211), Database accession no. 1646560-09-9, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20141211), Database accession no. 1638536-50-1, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20100527), Database accession no. 1225389-46-7, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20100527), Database accession no. 1225389-45-6, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20090130), Database accession no. 1098107-07-3, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20090130), Database accession no. 1098106-07-0, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20090130), Database accession no. 1098104-35-8, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20000508), Database accession no. 263916-95-6, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (19990528), Database accession no. 223654-82-8, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20150908), Database accession no. 1803418-36-1, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20140407), Database accession no. 1581311-49-0, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20140407), Database accession no. 1581311-48-9, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20110324), Database accession no. 1269763-65-6, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20090215), Database accession no. 1106005-31-5, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20090215), Database accession no. 1106005-25-7, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20080922), Database accession no. 1051472-23-1, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20070510), Database accession no. 934537-51-6, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20040116), Database accession no. 638214-15-0, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20110105), Database accession no. 1258410-97-7, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (20000516), Database accession no. 264912-33-6, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | [X] - REGISTRY, (19841116), Database accession no. 52500-13-7, URL: STN [X] 1-8, 11 * ), * | by applicant | WO2012168944 | WO2015033299 | WO2015033301 | WO2015034820 | WO2015036927 | WO2015044900 | WO2015160641 | - Eur. J. Immunol., (20020000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 634 - 643 |